Everette v. Supplemental Health Care, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rose Everette
Defendant: Supplemental Health Care, Inc. and Jacqueline Urbanczyk
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01398
Filed: March 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
July 16, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Motions terminated: 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re CMC filed by Rose Everette. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/12/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
August 12, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT URBANCZYK SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
August 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
November 14, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/14/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Everette v. Supplemental Health Care, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Everette
Represented By: Walter L. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supplemental Health Care, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Urbanczyk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]