Hall v. Diaz

Petitioner: Vincent Hall
Respondent: Ralph M. Diaz
Case Number: 3:2013cv01426
Filed: March 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: PSLC RMH
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 12/12/2013. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/09/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
May 5, 2015 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS; DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/04/2015. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
April 24, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Mixed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)
June 13, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
July 22, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Motion for Reconsideration, Vacating Order of Dismissal and Re-opening Case. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2013)
August 1, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Attorney to File Notice of Appearance or Notice of Non-Appearance. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/31/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Vincent Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ralph M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.