Square, Inc. v. Morales

Defendant: Fernando Morales
Plaintiff: Square, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01431
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 9 Stipulation filed by Square, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 7/16/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/23/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/13/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 28, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Saundra Brown Armstrong. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/28/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
July 10, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Responses due by 7/19/2013. Replies due by 8/9/2013.. Signed by Judge ARMSTRONG on 7/9/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
August 26, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Steven P. Tepera. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
November 27, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION ***Civil Case Terminated.*** Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 11/27/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Square, Inc. v. Morales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Morales
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Square, Inc.
Represented By: Steven C. Carlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]