Webber v. Gipson

Petitioner: Doyal M. Webber
Respondent: Connie Gipson
Case Number: 3:2013cv01444
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Kings
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/6/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
November 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Vince Chhabria granting 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
April 15, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Habeas Answer due by 6/14/2013. Petitioner's Traverse due by 7/12/2013. Petitioner's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. Petitioner's 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/15/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webber v. Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Doyal M. Webber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Gipson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.