Blue Growth Holdings Ltd v. Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Blue Growth Holdings Ltd
Defendant: Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC and Joseph M. Aaron
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01452
Filed: April 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 31, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 20 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 15 Case Management Scheduling Order filed by Blue Growth Holdings Ltd. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/31/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
June 20, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER granting 26 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Plaintiff Blue Growth Holdings Ltd.s Deadline To File A Reply In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Blue Growth Holdings Ltd. Reset Deadlines as to 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof. Replies due by 6/25/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/19/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
September 4, 2013 42 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
March 18, 2014 58 Featured Case ORDER granting 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 51 Amended Complaint, Stipulation to Dismiss Beth Aaron From the First Amended Complaint and to Dismiss Count III of the First Amended Complaint filed by Blue Growth Holdings Ltd. Beth Aaron terminated Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/17/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Blue Growth Holdings Ltd v. Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blue Growth Holdings Ltd
Represented By: Pamela Tsao
Represented By: Robert Houston Dewberry
Represented By: Joshua David Wayser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mainstreet Limited Ventures, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Aaron
Represented By: Robert Houston Dewberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]