Rockridge Trust et al v. Wells Fargo NA et al

Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solution LLC, Wells Fargo NA, Bank of America NA and First American Loanstar Trustee Services LLC
Plaintiff: Rockridge Trust and Ray K. Shahani
Case Number: 3:2013cv01457
Filed: April 2, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 99 Stipulation To Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Ray K. Shahani, Rockridge Trust. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2014)
February 13, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 99 Stipulation To Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Ray K. Shahani, Rockridge Trust. Mediation to be completed by 6/30/14. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/12/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 19, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 78 First American Trustee Servicing Solutions LLC's Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 80 Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Bank of America, N.A.'s Motion to Dismiss (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2014)
May 6, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court Discovery Order re 109 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 6, 2014. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 6, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing hearing re 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment or in the Alternative for Summary Adjudication; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Bank of America NA, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage to 06/20/2014 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on May 6, 2014. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
April 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Plaintiff and Defendants counsel shall participate in a telephone conference, to be scheduled by the ADR Unit as soon as possible but no later than May 1, 2013.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/10/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
June 6, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART 123 Request for Oral Argument and Leave to File Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on June 6, 2014. (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 20, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 126 Stipulation, filed by Bank of America NA, Wells Fargo NA. It is hereby ordered that the hearing dte of 6/20/14 at 9:30 AM on the Motion for Summary Judgment is VACATED. The further case management conference currently set f or 725/14 at 2:00 PM shall remmain on calendar. At the case mangement conference the Court will discuss re-setting the hearing date on the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/20/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (klhS, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/21/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
June 24, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 8 Motion to Dismiss; granting 15 Motion to Dismiss; Dismissing the Complaint without prejudice. (jcslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
September 25, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 47 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss (jcslc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
October 29, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, signed 10/29/13, re 74 Stipulation To Continue Defendant's Response Deadline to Second Amended Complaint filed by Bank of America NA, Wells Fargo NA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/29/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
January 7, 2014 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 89 Stipulation To Continue Mediation Deadline to 3/31/14 filed by Bank of America NA, Wells Fargo NA. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/7/14. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rockridge Trust et al v. Wells Fargo NA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trustee Servicing Solution LLC
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo NA
Represented By: Maria Schindler
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Edward Rick Buell, III
Represented By: Mark Douglas Lonergan
Represented By: Maria Schindler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Loanstar Trustee Services LLC
Represented By: Glenn Harlan Wechsler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockridge Trust
Represented By: Ray Khem Shahani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray K. Shahani
Represented By: Ray Khem Shahani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]