Barajas v. Biggs et al

Defendant: Andrew Wilson, Robert Biggs, Chudy and Wilbur Suesberry
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Barajas
Case Number: 3:2013cv01469
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Madera
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/10/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
February 28, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/28/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
March 21, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/21/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
August 22, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Complaint due by 10/1/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/22/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
October 2, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barajas v. Biggs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Biggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Suesberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Edward Barajas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.