Francis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Adlean Francis
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01482
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WELLS FARGO'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT AS MOOT 10 ; STRIKING First Amended Complaint; GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
July 12, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 7/19/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 07/12/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/23/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2013: # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service Additional address) (lmh, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Amended Complaint 28 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/6/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
April 4, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE to ADR Unit for assessment telephone conference. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/4/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Francis v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Adam Frederick Summerfield
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlean Francis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]