Guinn et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Plaintiff: Edmund J. Prisby, Debra Hinton, Thomas Murphy, Robert A. Grainger, Wendy S. Grainer, Jose V. Vigil, Lorraine Aranaydo, Maurice Miller, Dale Guinn, Lois A. Andrews, Gerald Aranaydo, Pamela McCauley, Randy L. Fox, Helen Vigil, Nancy L. Bunn, Robert L. Biggiam, Lillian M. Anderson, Audrey C. Matthew, Donna Roach, Doris Olson, Needham O. Bunn, Jimmie Wright, Liz Murphy, Robert E. Mills, Larry J. McCauley, Thomas H. Sanders, Bonnie R. O'Neal, Sandra Prisby, Melissa Neal, Calvin Hargrove, Foy C. Hinton, Charlie S. Overby, Edwin D. West, Anne M. West, Bonita L. Erie, Mary E. Salerno, Ora Whiting, Ray V. Bobo, Marilyn A. Bobo, Paul M. Collins, Daniel E. Noble, Judith C. Noble, Alfred T. Boutwell, Audrey C. Boutwell, Kathy Strausser, Patricia Riccardi, Anthony M. Riccardi, Lewis S. Boyce, Florence Boyce, Edna L. Burge and Bernice L. Armstead
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01487
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 8, 2013 11 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 10 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
May 10, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STAY AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting 9 Motion to Stay; finding as moot 15 Motion to Remand; finding as moot 18 Motion to Shorten Time]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
July 9, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 27 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of New Jersey, MDL 2418. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Guinn et al v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund J. Prisby
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hinton
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Murphy
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Grainger
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy S. Grainer
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose V. Vigil
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorraine Aranaydo
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Miller
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Guinn
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois A. Andrews
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Aranaydo
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela McCauley
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy L. Fox
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Vigil
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy L. Bunn
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Biggiam
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian M. Anderson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey C. Matthew
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Roach
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Olson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Needham O. Bunn
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Wright
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liz Murphy
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Mills
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry J. McCauley
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas H. Sanders
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie R. O'Neal
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Prisby
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Neal
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Hargrove
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foy C. Hinton
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie S. Overby
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin D. West
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. West
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonita L. Erie
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E. Salerno
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ora Whiting
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray V. Bobo
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn A. Bobo
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul M. Collins
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel E. Noble
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith C. Noble
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred T. Boutwell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey C. Boutwell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy Strausser
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Riccardi
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony M. Riccardi
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis S. Boyce
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florence Boyce
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna L. Burge
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernice L. Armstead
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]