Green, et al., v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Plaintiff: Allen S. Kohllman, Richard C. Huebner, Autry J. Taylor, Edward C. Marples, Mark A. Jones, Ruth F. Wheeler-Collinson, Mary V. Adams, Roger L. Collinson, Teresa Pelham, Dixie Ross, Larry D. Ross, Arthur H. Bursey, Mavis F. Marlowe, Peggy A. Jones, Walter E. Jones, Valerie D. Jones, Daniel L. Robertson, Judith C. Chaney, Carol Robertson, Violet R. Nordby, Floyd Rodgers, Jr., Bruce A. McIntire, Jasper M. Toomey, Sidney Schnell, Felix Sanchez, Larry B. Lee, Robert L. Green, Sharon R. Bailey, Levester Wallace, Robert E. Feinsilver, Sara Jane Feinsilver, Craig J. Herwig, Timothy R. Long, Robin L. Martin, Sarah S. Kohllman, Sandra Clay, Richard E. Cromas, Eleanor Schnell, Linda R. Paul, Robert L. Paul, Kevin J. Martin, Angela M. Marples, Charlotte Toomey, Lynnette L. McIntire, Wynella P. Wilson, Linda Jones, Toney J. Clay, Richard F. Allbee, Jean E. Allbee, Alva L. Howell, Amber Howell, Brenda R. Cromas, Kathy B. Box-Guillotte, Earl Guillotte, Archie Brooks, Judith A. Dahlquist, John L. Dalhquist, Jose M. Martinez, James E. Blair, Annie Blair, Loretta A. Hull, Buddy B. Cumber, Vanessa L. Cumber, Edgar L. McLaughlin, Lisa M. McLaughlin, Margaret A. Stai, Floyd E. Stai, Billie D. Martin, Geneva Johnson, Larry E. Johnson, Richard Chind and Lee P. Sox
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company and McKesson Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01489
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2013 17 Featured Case Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 9 Motion to Stay.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
July 9, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASES. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
August 8, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE To the United States District Court for the District of New Jersey. IN RE: PLAVIX MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO.II) MDL No. 2418. Signed by John G. Heyburn II, Chairman of the Panel on 8/6/13. (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Green, et al., v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen S. Kohllman
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C. Huebner
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autry J. Taylor
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward C. Marples
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Jones
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth F. Wheeler-Collinson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary V. Adams
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L. Collinson
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Pelham
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dixie Ross
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Ross
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur H. Bursey
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mavis F. Marlowe
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy A. Jones
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter E. Jones
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie D. Jones
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L. Robertson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith C. Chaney
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Robertson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Violet R. Nordby
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Rodgers, Jr.
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce A. McIntire
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasper M. Toomey
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sidney Schnell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Sanchez
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry B. Lee
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Green
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon R. Bailey
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levester Wallace
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Feinsilver
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Jane Feinsilver
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig J. Herwig
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Long
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin L. Martin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah S. Kohllman
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Clay
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard E. Cromas
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Schnell
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda R. Paul
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Paul
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin J. Martin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela M. Marples
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Toomey
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette L. McIntire
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wynella P. Wilson
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Jones
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toney J. Clay
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard F. Allbee
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean E. Allbee
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alva L. Howell
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Howell
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda R. Cromas
Represented By: Marissa Christina Langhoff
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Represented By: Hunter J. Shkolnik
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathy B. Box-Guillotte
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Guillotte
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archie Brooks
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith A. Dahlquist
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Dalhquist
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose M. Martinez
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Blair
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Blair
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta A. Hull
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy B. Cumber
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa L. Cumber
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar L. McLaughlin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa M. McLaughlin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret A. Stai
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd E. Stai
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billie D. Martin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geneva Johnson
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry E. Johnson
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Chind
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee P. Sox
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Kelly Ann McMeekin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy Michael McLaughlin
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: Maurice Abraham Leiter
Represented By: Michael J. Baker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]