Allums v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Plaintiff: Craig Lynn Allums
Case Number: 3:2013cv01496
Filed: April 3, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE MOTION FOR STAY by Hon. William Alsup granting 13 Motion to Stay.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 10/17/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
February 25, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 10 Motion for Summary Judgment.(whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allums v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Carolyn Beth Chen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Lynn Allums
Represented By: Amanda C Holder-Robinson
Represented By: Glenn M. Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]