Schmidt v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Lonnie G. Schmidt
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and NDeX West
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01509
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 18 Clerks Notice,. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS re 17 Renotice motion hearing, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., 6 MOTION to Dismiss The Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 31, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2013.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/31/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge William Alsup [granting 6 Motion to Dismiss; granting 21 Motion for Joinder]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
July 18, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 7/18/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2013)
September 6, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 41 Request for Judicial Notice, filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/6/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 26, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SUBMIT OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/26/2013. (whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
October 7, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS FEES by Hon. William Alsup granting 40 Motion for Attorney Fees.(whalc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Schmidt v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie G. Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDeX West
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]