Gitson et al v. Clover-Stornetta Farms, Inc.

Defendant: Clover-Stornetta Farms, Inc.
Plaintiff: Amy Gitson and Deborah Ross
Case Number: 3:2013cv01517
Filed: April 4, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court MODIFIED STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION re 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLA INT filed by Deborah Ross, Amy Gitson. Responses due by 9/4/2013. Replies due by 9/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 10/9/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/12/2013. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
October 1, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
December 5, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Deborah Ross, Amy Gitson, Motions terminated: 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 21 Case Management Scheduling Order, Set Deadlines, Set Hearings,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Deborah Ross, Amy Gitson.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 12/4/13. (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
January 15, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 22 Motion to Dismiss (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
March 31, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting 54 Motion for Leave to File (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gitson et al v. Clover-Stornetta Farms, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clover-Stornetta Farms, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Gitson
Represented By: Pierce Gore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Ross
Represented By: Pierce Gore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]