Dairy et al v. Bonham

Plaintiff: Lynette Dairy, Joseph Spier, Phyllis Spier, F/V Brooke Michelle LLC, William "Bill" Currie, Ralph Dairy and Howard Moore
Defendant: Charlton Bonham
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01518
Filed: April 4, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/26/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2014)
February 27, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Parties' Request for Clarification 115 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 02/27/2014. (dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2014)
March 7, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/7/2014. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
May 2, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 5/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
July 23, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 21 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
August 22, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 53 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration. Defendant's Opposition due within two weeks of date of this Order. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/22/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
April 8, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER bye Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: James S. Crane (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
April 8, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice r: Thane W. Tienson. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
October 17, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 52 53 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration and Motion for Leave to Amend. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
December 9, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Denying in Part 67 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Dairy et al v. Bonham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Dairy
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: James S. Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Spier
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: James S. Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Spier
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: James S. Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F/V Brooke Michelle LLC
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: James S. Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William "Bill" Currie
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: James S. Crane
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Dairy
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: James S. Crane
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Moore
Represented By: James S. Crane
Represented By: Gwendolyn L. Fanger
Represented By: Thane Walker Tienson
Represented By: James Patrick Walsh
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlton Bonham
Represented By: Gary Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]