Charvat v. Shinseki et al

Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs and Eric Shinseki
Plaintiff: Mylea M. Charvat
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01530
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Mylea M. Charvat. Case Management Statement due by 8/15/2013. Case Management Conference reset for 8/22/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 7/1/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
August 19, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Case Management Statement/Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Mylea M. Charvat. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 8/19/2013. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
July 23, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IN LIGHT OF SETTLEMENT by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley granting 30 Stipulation.(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Charvat v. Shinseki et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Shinseki
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mylea M. Charvat
Represented By: Daniel F. Crowley
Represented By: Robert M. Bone
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]