Hightower v. Director et al

Defendant: Social Security Administration Department, United Kingdom of Great Britain, Director and U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claim Council
Plaintiff: Dionne R. Hightower
Case Number: 3:2013cv01538
Filed: April 5, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE REGARDING SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND RULE 12 (b)(6) DISMISSAL MOTIONS.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/16/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
August 22, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment without Prejudice (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 43 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing action without prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to close the file. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (klhS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hightower v. Director et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Department
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Kingdom of Great Britain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Court of Appeals for Veterans Claim Council
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dionne R. Hightower
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]