Shaw v. Khadembashi et al

Defendant: Jill Khiew Lo, Elahe Khadembashi and Dick Wah Lo
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Case Number: 3:2013cv01694
Filed: April 15, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: American with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 21 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE [re 30 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Sobhanieh Mostakhdemin, Walter J Robinson, Jill Khiew Lo, Dick Wah Lo, Elahe Khadembashi, Fereidoon Ghiassi, Cecil Shaw]. Case Management Statement due by 1/2/2014. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/9/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/27/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
December 19, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SETTLEMENT AND JANUARY 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/19/2013. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
January 8, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 36 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION AND JANUARY 9 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/8/2014. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014).
January 9, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/9/2014. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
June 17, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM SERVICE DEADLINE re 7 Proposed Order filed by Cecil Shaw (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaw v. Khadembashi et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Khiew Lo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elahe Khadembashi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dick Wah Lo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecil Shaw
Represented By: Tanya Eugene Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]