Marshall v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Company and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Michael Marshall
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01747
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 12, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re 22 Statement of Recent Decision filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Replies due by 6/14/2013 AT NOON. Responses due by 6/14/2013 AT NOON.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/12/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 27, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte granting 11 Motion to Dismiss; denying 15 Motion to Change Venue (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
April 24, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO ADR UNIT FOR ASSESSMENT TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 4/24/2013. (knmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Marshall v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Company
Represented By: Yelena Cayton
Represented By: Robin Prema Wright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Rapkine
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Marshall
Represented By: Jamil Louis White
Represented By: Michael Dennis Maloney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]