San Francisco Herring Association v. United States Department of the Interior et al

Defendant: Sally Jewell, United States National Park Service, United States Department of the Interior, Jonathan Jarvis and Frank Dean
Plaintiff: San Francisco Herring Association
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01750
Filed: April 18, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 10, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO PARTIES REGARDING QUESTIONS AT HEARING re 75 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2014)
January 15, 2014 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 75 MOTION FOR A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION.(jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
August 23, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SCHEDULE FOR CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY re 26 Statement. Administrative Record due by 9/20/2013. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/26/2013. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/24/2013. Defendant's Reply and Opposition due by 11/14/2013. Plaintiff's Reply due by 11/21/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/12/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 23, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
December 5, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING DECEMBER 12, 2013 HEARING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 5, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO CALIFORNIA ATTORNEY GENERAL KAMALA HARRIS; INVITING VIEWS OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ON ISSUES PRESENTED IN THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 11, 2013 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ADDITIONAL NOTICE REGARDING DECEMBER 12 HEARING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 11, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
December 19, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION re 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE ISSUE OF JURISDICTION filed by United States Department of the Interior; 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by San Francisco Herring Association. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE re 70 Notice. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 20, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 82 MOTION to Shorten Time Concerning Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by San Francisco Herring Association, ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 75 MOTION for Prel iminary Injunction , Set/Reset Deadlines as to 75 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/3/2014. Replies due by 1/8/2014.Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 20, 2013. (jstlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: San Francisco Herring Association v. United States Department of the Interior et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States National Park Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Interior
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Jarvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dean
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco Herring Association
Represented By: Stuart George Gross
Represented By: Meredith L Erdman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]