Touchscreen Gestures LLC v. HTC Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Touchscreen Gestures LLC
Defendant: HTC Corporation and HTC America Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01772
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 32 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 17, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATIONS OF ATTORNEY WINSTON HUFF AND ATTORNEY DEBORAH JAGAI by Judge Alsup denying 26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
June 7, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING HUFF PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 37 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 7, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JAGAI PHV by Hon. William Alsup granting 36 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
July 1, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup denying (44) Motion to Continue in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-EMC, 3:13-cv-02758-MMC, 5:13-cv-02759-EJD(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
July 8, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO APPEAR IN LIEU OF LEAD COUNSEL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Appear by Telephone.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 23, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting (54) Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-WHA, 3:13-cv-02758-WHA, 3:13-cv-02759-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 24, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting (55) Stipulation in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-WHA, 3:13-cv-02758-WHA, 3:13-cv-02759-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 26, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
September 4, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RELATING CASE by Hon. William Alsup granting 63 Motion to Relate Case.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 26, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART REQUESTS FOR LEAVE TO FILE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part (66) Ex Parte Application in case 3:13-cv-01772-WHA.Associated Cases: 3:13-cv-01772-WHA, 3:13-cv-02478-WHA, 3:13-cv-02715-WHA(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
October 17, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS AND COUNTERCLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup granting 69 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 22, 2013 76 Opinion or Order of the Court FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD ORDER RE PRECIS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE EARLY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 22, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013) Modified on 10/22/2013 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PRECIS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE EARLY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 22, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 24, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRECIS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE EARLY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION by Hon. William Alsup granting 71 Motion leave to file.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
November 8, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE JOINT LETTER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 7, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
December 4, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRECIS REQUEST FOR MOTION TO STRIKE AND DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting 86 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
December 7, 2013 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE STIPULATION RE ENTRY OF JOINTLY PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 7, 2013. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Touchscreen Gestures LLC v. HTC Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Touchscreen Gestures LLC
Represented By: Arthur Isaac Navarro
Represented By: Deborah Jagai
Represented By: Winston Oliver Huff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Jerry Robin Selinger
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Powley
Represented By: John Clarence Carey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America Inc
Represented By: John Clarence Carey
Represented By: Susan Elizabeth Powley
Represented By: Jerry Robin Selinger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]