Adaptix, Inc. v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al

Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC and Cellco Partnership
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01774
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2013 123 Opinion or Order of the Court CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 19, 2013. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
March 26, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO COMPEL (171 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc., (145 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (162 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Notice (Other) filed b y Cellco Partnership, (144 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (170 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (175 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (161 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (152 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (153 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 26, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
April 17, 2014 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (147) Administrative Motion to File Under Se al; denying (149) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administ rative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (165) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (166) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (161) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (163) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 29, 2014 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (205) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (172) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (200) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (202) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (191) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (186) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
May 9, 2014 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (202) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (170) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (198) Administ rative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (200) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (189) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (183) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 2, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re VanHouten. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re Price. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice re: Retsky (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 20, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of pending motion to relate cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/20/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
August 14, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 22, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 22, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel McArtur Shafer
Represented By: Steven Edward Lipman
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: James C. Hall
Represented By: Samiyah Diaz
Represented By: Paul J Cronin
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By: Phillip David Price
Represented By: David S. Bloch
Represented By: Jonathan E. Retsky
Represented By: Tyler T. VanHoutan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Patrick Colbert Clutter, IV
Represented By: Mark Donnell Flanagan
Represented By: Robert Michael Galvin
Represented By: Geoffrey Mark Godfrey
Represented By: Michael E Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]