Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. et al Featured Case

Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC and Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv01777
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 26, 2014 442 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. of Related Case Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 25, 2014 441 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING HTC'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AS TO EXHIBITS 17 AND 20 re 438 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 409 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 377 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 350 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 25, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2014)
November 25, 2014 440 Supplemental Declaration of Jamie L. Duncan, III in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal [Dkt. 367 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 11/25/2014) Modified on 11/25/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 24, 2014 439 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (435) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (374) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (382) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (347) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (406) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 24, 2014 438 (AMENDED) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Hearing Re: Sealing held on 11/24/2014. HTC to submit a declaration with proposed order confirming that green highlighting in administrative motions to seal are sections HTC seeks to redact. Court Reporter present: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Michael Ercolini. Defendant Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Gina Bibby, Craig Davis, Jonathan Hardt, John Moehringer, Mark Selwyn, Jennifer Tempesta, James Duncan & Fred Williams. Following today's hearing, the court considered AT&T's request regarding Docket Nos. 380, 388 and 431 in Case No. 13-1777 (Docket Nos. 352, 360 and 402 in Case No. 13-2023) and rules as follows: As to Exhibit F to Docket No. 380, designations highlighted in green at Docket No. 388-6 SEALED and designations highlighted in yellow at Docket No. 380-4 EXCEPT for those lines identified at Docket No. 388-1 at 8 SEALED; all other designations UNSEALED. As to the declaration at Docket No. 431, the court finds that it was improperly filed. Specifically, the declaration refers to yellow highlighting in the underlying documents at Docket No. 393, when the underlying document contains only green highlighting. Similarly, the declaration refers to yellow highlighting in Exhibit B at Docket No. 393-5 when in fact the underlying document contains no highlighting at all. Finally, under Civ L.R. 79-5(d)(1) (D), the unredacted version of the document sought to be sealed should have been highlighted or marked by some other clear method to indicate the designated material. The laundry list of designations contained only in the declaration at Docket No. 431 does not satisfy this requirement. As such, the designations indicated at Docket No. 431 are UNSEALED. This is a text only Minute Entry. (ofr, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2014 437 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal: Hearing Re: Sealing held on 11/24/2014. HTC to submit a declaration with proposed order confirming that green highlighting in administrative motions to seal are sections HTC seeks to redact. The court will review AT&T's Declarations Re: Docket Nos. 380 & 393 in CV13-01777 and 352 & 400 in CV14-02023. Court Reporter present: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Michael Ercolini. Defendant Attorney(s) present (telephonically): Gina Bibby, Craig Davis, Jonathan Hardt, John Moehringer, Mark Selwyn, Jennifer Tempesta, James Duncan & Fred Williams. This is a text only Minute Entry (ofr, COURT STAFF)
November 24, 2014 436 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING RE SEALING: Hearing (Re: 367-3 in CV13-01777, 328-2 in CV13-01778, 299-2 in CV13-01844 & 341-3 in CV13-02023) set for 11/24/2014 at 1:00 PM (Special Set) before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Parties are welcome to attend but not required to. Parties that wish to attend are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 21, 2014 435 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Briefing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster ISO Administrative Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Foster, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Foster, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Foster, # 5 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 20, 2014 434 Featured Case OMNIBUS ORDER RE MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG: 310 , 312 , 314 , 317 , 319 , 321 , 326 , 332 , 335 , 336 , 338 , 340 , 346 , 347 , 348 , 349 , 350 , 357 , 360 , 363 , 365 , 367 , 369 , 376 & 380 ; in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG: 328 , 334 , 336 , 338 , 343 , 348 , 351 , 366 , 367 , 372 , 376 , 379 , 380 , 383 , 387 , 388 , 389 , 390 , 391 , 393 , 406 , 411 , 414 , 416 , 418 , 420 , 422 , 428 , 429 , 432 & 433 ; in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG: 297 , 303 , 305 , 306 , 309 , 311 , 314 , 328 , 332 , 333 , 336 , 339 , 343 , 344 , 345 , 346 , 355 , 358 , 360 , 362 , 364 , 369 & 371 ; in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG: 287 , 289 , 290 , 293 , 295 , 299 , 302 , 303 , 306 , 308 , 310 , 313 , 317 , 318 , 319 , 320 , 327 , 329 , 331 , 332 , 335 , 340 , 341 , 342 & 344 ; in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: 304 , 310 , 312 , 314 , 317 , 318 , 323 , 326 , 339 , 341 , 345 , 348 , 351 , 352 , 355 , 359 , 360 , 361 , 362 , 363 , 365 , 378 , 383 , 386 , 388 , 390 , 392 , 394 , 399 , 400 , 403 & 404 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2014)
November 11, 2014 433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.s (Apple) Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green and Exhibits filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit A)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2014 432 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's (AT&T) Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit A)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2014 431 Declaration of James C. Williams in Support of 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 393 ) (Williams, James) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 430 respectfully submits the attached Declaration of Michael B. Powell and accompanying exemplary supporting documents in support of Apple Inc.s Administrative Motion To File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc.s Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Apple Reply, # 3 Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit 10)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 11/11/2014) Modified text on 11/12/2014 ,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 11, 2014 429 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion to Exclude Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green on Four Separate and Independent Grounds filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 11, 2014 428 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple Inc. and Cellco Partnership D/B/A Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green (see Dkt. Nos. 395 and 406 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/11/2014)
November 6, 2014 427 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Williams, James) (Filed on 11/6/2014)
November 5, 2014 426 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/04/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (372 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/3/2015. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 4, 2014 425 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/4/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: 1.) Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. Nos. 307 in CV13- 01776, 333 in -01777, 302 in -01778, 285 in -01844 & 309 in -02023) 2.) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity (Dkt. Nos. 309 in CV13-01776, 335 in -01777, 304 in -01778, 286 in 01844 & 311 in -02023) 3.) Defendant Verizon's Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 311 in CV13- 01776 & 288 in -01844) 4.) Defendants HTC America Inc. & HTC Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 305-3 in CV13-01778 & 289-3 in -01844) 5.) Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 313 in CV13-01776, 337 in -01777 & 313 in -02023) 6.) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers (Dkt. Nos. 315 in CV13-01776, 340 in -01777, 307 in -01778, 291 in -01844 & 316 in -02023) 7.) Defendant Apple, Inc. & Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green (Dkt. Nos. 327 in CV13-01776, 368 in -01777 & 340 in -02023) 8.) Defendant AT&T Mobility's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (Dkt. Nos. 339 in CV13-01777, 303-3 in -01778 & 315 in -02023) 9.) Defendants AT&T, HTC & Verizon's Motion to Strike & Exclude the Opinions & Testimony of Philip Green (Dkt. Nos. 369 in CV13-01777, 329 in -01778, 300 in -01844 & 342 in -02023). The court takes matters under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2014)
November 3, 2014 424 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY re (326 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG), (359 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (385 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG), (357 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), and (413 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on November 3, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2014)
October 31, 2014 423 REPLY (re 369 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Exhibit 22 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit 23 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 24 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 25 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 26 (LODGED UNDER SEAL))(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 422 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green and Exhibits Thereto filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Unredacted Version of Reply in Support of Motion to Strike, # 4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 25, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, # 9 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 421 REPLY (re 340 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" ) (Redacted) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Exhibit 18 (Redacted), # 3 Exhibit 19)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 420 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Defendants AT&T, Apple, and HTC's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Defendants AT&T, Apple, and HTC's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers", # 4 Exhibit 18)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 419 REPLY (re 368 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green ) (Document Sought to be Sealed) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 6 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 7 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 8 (Document Sought to be Sealed))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 418 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple Inc. and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Reply Brief in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Philip Green, # 5 Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit 7, # 7 Exhibit 8)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 417 REPLY (re 337 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Document Sought To Be Sealed) ) filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 8 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 9 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 10(Document Sought to be Sealed))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit 8, # 5 Exhibit 9, # 6 Exhibit 10)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 415 REPLY (re 335 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness ) (Document Sought to be Sealed) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4 (Document Sought to be Sealed), # 6 Exhibit 5)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 414 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James C. Williams, # 2 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 3 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity, # 6 Exhibit 4)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 413 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery Deadline filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 412 REPLY (re 334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&Ts Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Further Support of Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 411 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement and Exhibit 18 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 AT&T's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, # 3 Exhibit 18 (UNDER SEAL), # 4 Proposed Order to Seal, # 5 Proof of Service)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 410 REPLY (re 333 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 409 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (405) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (377) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 408 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (404) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (376) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 31, 2014 407 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT NOVEMBER 4, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (403) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (375) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 30, 2014 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 395 filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph Messina ISO Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Sealed Opposition to Motion to Exclude Green, # 4 Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Exclude Green, # 5 Exhibit B to Opposition to Motion to Exclude Green)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 405 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the November 4, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Pankratz, Kurt) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 404 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the November 4, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 30, 2014 403 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the Hearing on Dispositive and Daubert Motions set for November 4, 2014 at 1:00 p.m filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Tempesta, Jennifer) (Filed on 10/30/2014)
October 29, 2014 402 Minute Entry: Motion to Compel Hearing held on 10/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re (386 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (342 In 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) and (358 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG). The court denies Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2014)
October 29, 2014 401 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO SUBMIT MATERIALS IN SUPPORT OF SEALING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO DAUBERT AND SUMMARY JUDGMENT BRIEFING re (372 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG)(323 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG)(355 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) (400 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) (350 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on October 29, 2014. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
October 28, 2014 400 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order by Plaintiff and Defendants Regarding Extension of Time to Submit Materials in Support of Sealing Documents Filed in Connection with Daubert and Summary Judgment Briefing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/28/2014)
October 27, 2014 399 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CORRECT ASSERTED PATENT AND DENYING CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (270) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (247) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (247) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (240) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (249) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Adaptix, Inc. is required to E-FILE the amended document in cases 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 398 Letter Brief re 386 Discovery Letter BriefIn Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Reeder Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 386 ) (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 27, 2014 397 Discovery Letter Brief Opposition re 386 Adaptix's Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/27/2014)
October 25, 2014 396 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER *** RESPONSE (re 368 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joseph Messina ISO Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Phillip Green, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/25/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 25, 2014 395 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 406 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Joseph Messina ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit Redacted Document to be Sealed, # 4 Exhibit Sealed Document, # 5 Exhibit Sealed Expert Report of Phillip Green)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/25/2014) Modified on 10/31/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 394 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER *** RESPONSE (re 368 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Messina ISO Adaptix's Opp. to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Decl. of Messina ISO Adaptix's Opp. to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to Decl. of Messina ISO Adaptix's Opp. to Defendants' Daubert M, # 4 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2014 393 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 4 Unredacted Version of Adaptix's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B to Adaptix's Opposition)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/24/2014)
October 23, 2014 392 EXHIBITS re 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. No. 337 ) As Previously Identified in the Sealing Papers at Dkt. Nos. 336 , Exhibit 7 to Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 379 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 21, 2014 391 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion of Defendant, AT&T Mobility LLC, for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (see Dkt. Nos. 383 and 384 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Caloyannides Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit I to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 390 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Adaptix, Inc.'s Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" (see Dkt. No. 382 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Adaptix's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Caloyannides Declaration)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 389 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (see Dkt. Nos. 380 and 381 ) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Opposition Brief, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Caloyannides Declaration, # 5 Exhibit E to Plaintiff's Opposition)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 388 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of (i) Adaptixs Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, (ii) Declaration of Dr. Michael Caloyannides, and (iii) Exhibits filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Johnson K. Kuncheria in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 3 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 4 (LODGED UNDER SEAL))(Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 21, 2014 387 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of (i) Adaptixs Opposition to AT&Ts Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement, (ii) Declaration of Dr. Michael Caloyannides, and (iii) Exhibits filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Johnson K. Kuncheria in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 3 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 Exhibit 4 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 7 Exhibit 5 (LODGED UNDER SEAL))(Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 20, 2014 386 Discovery Letter BriefIn Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents of Defendant AT&T Mobility, LLC filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 20, 2014 385 CLERK'S NOTICE RE COURT DEADLINE FOR REPLY BRIEFS ON DAUBERT MOTIONS: Reply Briefs on Daubert Motions due by 10/31/2014 [See Civ. L.R. 7-3(c)]. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2014)
October 17, 2014 384 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR .LOCK REQUESTED BY FILER *** RESPONSE (re 339 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 11 Exhibit I to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 12 Proposed Order to Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/17/2014) Modified on 10/27/2014 (fff, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2014 383 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster ISO Adaptix's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unedacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to AT&T's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit I)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 382 RESPONSE (re 340 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 381 RESPONSE (re 337 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Document Sought To Be Sealed) ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 10 Exhibit H to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 11 Proposed Order I to Declaration of Fulford ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 380 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Apple's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 5 Redacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 6 Unredacted Version of Declaration of Caloyannides ISO Plaintiff's Opposition, # 7 Unredacted version of Exhibit B, # 8 Unredacted version of Exhibit C, # 9 Unredacted version of Exhibit D, # 10 Unredacted version of Exhibit E, # 11 Unredacted version of Exhibit F, # 12 Unredacted version of Exhibit G, # 13 Unredacted version of Exhibit H)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 379 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Consolidated Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Dkt. No. 337 ) As Previously Identified in the Sealing Papers at Dkt. Nos. 336 , 341 , 361 , and [320 in Case No. 5:13-cv-01776-PSG] filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Sealed Version), # 4 Apple Inc.s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Public Version), # 5 Exhibit 1 (Sealed Version), # 6 Exhibit 1 (Public Version), # 7 Exhibit 2 (Sealed Version), # 8 Exhibit 2 (Public Version), # 9 Exhibit 3 (Sealed Version), # 10 Exhibit 3 (Public Version))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 378 RESPONSE (re 335 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Caloyannides, # 2 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 6 Proposed Order)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 377 RESPONSE (re 333 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) (Defendants Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f)) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Defendants Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), # 2 Exhibit 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 Exhibit 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 Exhibit 3 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 9 Exhibit 8 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 10 Exhibit 9 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 11 Exhibit 10 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 12 Exhibit 11 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 13 Exhibit 12 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 16 Exhibit 15 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 17 Exhibit 16 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 18 Exhibit 17 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 18 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 20 Exhibit 19 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 23 Exhibit 22 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 24 Exhibit 23 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 25 Exhibit 24 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 26 Exhibit 25 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 27 Exhibit 26 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 28 Exhibit 27 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 29 Exhibit 28 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 30 Exhibit 29 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 31 Exhibit 30 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 32 Exhibit 31 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 33 Exhibit 32 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 34 Exhibit 33 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 35 Exhibit 34, # 36 Exhibit 35)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 17, 2014 376 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), and Exhibits 1-3, 5, 7-12, 14-19, and 21-33 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 UNREDACTED Version of Defendants' Opposition to Adaptix, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. § 102(f), # 3 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 1, # 4 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 2, # 5 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 3, # 6 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 5, # 7 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 7, # 8 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 8, # 9 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 9, # 10 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 10, # 11 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 11, # 12 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 12, # 13 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 14, # 14 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 15, # 15 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 16, # 16 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 17, # 17 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 18, # 18 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 19, # 19 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 21, # 20 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 22, # 21 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 23, # 22 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 24, # 23 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 25, # 24 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 26, # 25 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 27, # 26 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 28, # 27 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 29, # 28 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 30, # 29 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 31, # 30 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 32, # 31 UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit 33, # 32 Proposed Order, # 33 Proof of Service)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 16, 2014 375 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 10/16/2014)
October 14, 2014 Set Hearing: Discovery Hearing (In Re: Docket No. 365 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, Docket No. 327 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG and Docket No. 338 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) set for 10/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 374 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 373 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Daubert Motion, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 372 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Materials Regarding 367 AT&T, HTC, and Verizon's Motion to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 371 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (365) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (327) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (338) Motion f or Hearing in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)
October 14, 2014 370 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 332 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. As filed, the exhibits are only the cover pages to other materials. As the supporting declaration itself implicitly concedes, the cover pages are not in and of themselves confidential. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
October 10, 2014 369 MOTION to Strike and Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Philip Green filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bibby, # 2 1 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 3 2 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 4 3, # 5 4 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 6 5 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 7 6 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 8 7 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 9 8 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 10 9 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 11 10 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 12 11 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 13 12 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 14 13 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 15 14, # 16 15 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 17 16 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 18 17 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 19 18 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 20 19 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 20 (LODGED UNDER SEAL), # 22 Exhibit 21-1, # 23 Exhibit 21-2, # 24 Exhibit 21-3, # 25 Proposed Order)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 368 MOTION to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green re 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green and Certain Supporting Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/24/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 7 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 367 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Bibby, # 2 Declaration of Godfrey, # 3 Declaration of Duncan, # 4 Unredacted Version of Motion to Strike, # 5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, # 6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, # 9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 6, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, # 11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, # 13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 11, # 15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12, # 16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13, # 17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, # 18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, # 19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, # 20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, # 21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, # 22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, # 23 Proposed Order, # 24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 366 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s and Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green and Certain Supporting Exhibits filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey, # 2 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Apple's and Verizon's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony and Opinions of Philip Green, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Exhibit 2, # 7 Exhibit 3, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 10, 2014 365 MOTION for Hearing Regarding Adaptix's Motion to Compel Production of Documents by AT&T Mobility, LLC filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
October 8, 2014 364 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/03/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 362 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2015. (Related documents(s) 362 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 10/8/2014)
October 7, 2014 363 Featured Case ORDER AND STIPULATION UNDER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-12 IN SUPPORT OF ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (358) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:13-cv-01777- PSG; granting (333) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 5:13-cv- 02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 7, 2014 362 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/7/2014)
October 6, 2014 361 Declaration of David A. Kays for non-party Qualcomm Incorporated in Support of 336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 336 ) (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 360 Declaration of Johnson Kuncheria in Support of 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 351 ) (Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 6, 2014 359 Declaration of David A. Kays in Support of 343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to 328 AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike Declaration of David A. Kays for non-party Qualcomm Incorporated in Support of Sealing Certain Exhibits to AT&T Mobility's Motion to Strike filed byApple, Inc.. (Related document(s) 343 ) (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 3, 2014 358 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-11 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) [Proposed] Order and Stipulation Under Civil Local Rule 7-12 In Support of Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limits Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-11)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 10/3/2014)
October 3, 2014 357 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing re: Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Strike (Dkt. Nos. 328-3 in CV13-01777, 297-3 in -01778 & 304-3 in -02023) held on 10/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court denies Defendant' Motion to Strike. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/3/2014)
October 2, 2014 356 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE STIPULATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (353) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (328) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 355 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE OCTOBER 3, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (350) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (313) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (325) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 354 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE OCTOBER 3, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (349) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (312) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (324) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 353 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 352 Letter Brief re 328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 328 ) (Foster, James) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 351 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster ISO Adaptix's Administrative Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Redacted Version of Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike, # 4 Unredacted Version of Adaptixs Letter Brief In Response to AT&T Mobility LLCs Letter Brief In Support of Motion to Strike)(Foster, James) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 350 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for October 3, 2014 Hearing Regarding Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 349 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for October 3, 2014 Hearing Regarding Defendants' Motion to Strike filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Foster, James) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 30, 2014 348 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 1 and 10 to 334 AT&T Mobility LLCs Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 10)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 347 Declaration of James C. Williams in Support of 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Adaptix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 332 ) (Williams, James) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 346 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE OCTOBER 3, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (345) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (320) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 30, 2014 345 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for October 3, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
September 29, 2014 344 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9/23/2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Leo T. Mankiewicz, Telephone number 415 722-7045. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (305 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order, (83 in 5:14-cv-02895-PSG) Transcript Order, (327 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 10/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/30/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/29/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 29, 2014 343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to 328 AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1)*** Correction to 342 (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified text on 9/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2014 342 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit 1)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 29, 2014 341 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judge of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto Pursuant to Docket Nos. 312 , 336 , and 312 in C.A. 5:13-cv-1776, C.A. 5:13-cv-1777, and C.A. 5:13-cv-2023, filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael B. Powell, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Sought to be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Sought to be Sealed), # 4 Apple Motion for Summary Judgment (Sought to be Sealed))(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 9/29/2014) Modified on 9/30/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2014 340 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/27/2014)
September 26, 2014 339 MOTION for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/10/2014. Replies due by 10/17/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Ddeclaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16 - Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 338 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement: No "Selecting a Set of Candidate Subcarriers" filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Godfrey in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder in Support of Motion to Seal, # 3 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Motion to Seal, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED), # 6 Motion for Summary Judgment (UNDER SEAL), # 7 Declaration of Michael F. Reeder in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 8 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 9 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL), # 10 Exhibit 2, # 11 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), # 13 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # 15 Exhibit 7 (REDACTED), # 16 Exhibit 7 (UNDER SEAL), # 17 Exhibit 8 (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 8 (UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED), # 20 Exhibit 9 (UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # 22 Exhibit 10 (UNDER SEAL), # 23 Exhibit 11, # 24 Exhibit 12 (REDACTED), # 25 Exhibit 12 (UNDER SEAL), # 26 Exhibit 13 (REDACTED), # 27 Exhibit 13 (UNDER SEAL), # 28 Exhibit 14 (REDACTED), # 29 Exhibit 14 (UNDER SEAL), # 30 Exhibit 15 (REDACTED), # 31 Exhibit 15 (UNDER SEAL), # 32 Exhibit 16 (REDACTED), # 33 Exhibit 16 (UNDER SEAL), # 34 Exhibit 17, # 35 Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 337 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Document Sought To Be Sealed) filed by Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7 (Document Sought To Be Sealed), # 9 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 336 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement and Certain Exhibits Thereto filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Apple Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 335 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Based on Indefiniteness filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Professor Thomas E. Fuja, # 2 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 334 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&Ts Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (REDACTED), # 4 Motion for Summary Judgment of No Direct Infringement (UNDER SEAL), # 5 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 6 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED), # 7 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3, # 10 Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 5 (UNDER SEAL), # 13 Exhibit 6 (REDACTED), # 14 Exhibit 6 (UNDER SEAL), # 15 Exhibit 7, # 16 Exhibit 8, # 17 Exhibit 9 (REDACTED), # 18 Exhibit 9 (UNDER SEAL), # 19 Exhibit 10 (REDACTED), # 20 Exhibit 10 (UNDER SEAL), # 21 Exhibit 11 (REDACTED), # 22 Exhibit 11 (UNDER SEAL, # 23 Exhibit 12 (REDACTED), # 24 Exhibit 12 (UNDER SEAL), # 25 Exhibit 13 (REDACTED), # 26 Exhibit 13 (UNDER SEAL), # 27 Exhibit 14, # 28 Exhibit 15 (REDACTED), # 29 Exhibit 15 (UNDER SEAL, # 30 Exhibit 16 - Proposed Order)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 26, 2014 333 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under 35 U.S.C. 102 (f) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/4/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/17/2014. Replies due by 10/31/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon [FILED UNDER SEAL], # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 9 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2014) Modified on 9/26/2014 (incorrect event selected)(cv, COURT STAFF).
September 26, 2014 332 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Adaptix's Motion for Partial Summary Judgement filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit UNREDACTED Version of Exhibit C)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/26/2014)
September 24, 2014 331 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re (303 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 302 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 326 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 295 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 282 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 24, 2014 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 Set Hearing as to AT&T Mobility LLC's Motion to Strike (328-3 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (297-2 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) and (304-3 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) : Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 at 9:30 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 330 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT OCTOBER 3, 2014 MOTION TO STRIKE HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (329) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (298) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (305) Motion in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 329 MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE DISCOVERY DISPUTE filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 10/8/2014. Replies due by 10/15/2014. (Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2014)
September 24, 2014 328 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal AT&T Mobility LLC's Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Motion to Strike (REDACTED), # 4 Motion to Strike (CONFIDENTIAL), # 5 Declaration of Jennifer C. Tempesta in Support of Motion to Strike, # 6 Exhibit 1 *** DOCUMENT LOCKED *** , # 7 Exhibit 1 (CONFIDENTIAL), # 8 Exhibit 2, # 9 Exhibit 3 (REDACTED), # 10 Exhibit 3 (CONFIDENTIAL), # 11 Exhibit 4 (REDACTED), # 12 Exhibit 4 (CONFIDENTIAL), # 13 Exhibit 5 (Proposed Order))(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 9/24/2014) Modified on 9/29/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
September 24, 2014 327 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for 9/23/14 by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 9/24/2014) TRANSCRIBER: Leo Mankiewicz. Modified on 9/24/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2014 326 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case management scheduling order to be issued. (Court Reporter FTR: (5:00 to 6:06) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2014)
September 19, 2014 325 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (324) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (301) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 324 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 323 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLE INC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (322) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (300) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (299) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 322 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 321 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (318) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (295) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 19, 2014 320 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THESEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (319) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (293) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (298) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (280) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (296) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
September 18, 2014 319 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 318 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the September 23, 2014 Case Management Conference filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 18, 2014 317 EXHIBITS re 316 Joint Case Management Statement Exhibits A, B, C filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 316 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/18/2014)
September 17, 2014 316 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 17, 2014 315 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (314) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (289) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (294) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (276) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (291) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2014)
September 16, 2014 314 JOINT MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF THE DEADLINE FOR THE PARTIES TO FILE THEIR JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 (Proposed) Order) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/16/2014) Text modified on 9/17/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 12, 2014 313 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION RE EXPERT DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (311) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (286) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (289) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (273) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (288) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 312 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 9/23/2014 10:00 AM Case Management Conference is reset to 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)
September 12, 2014 311 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING EXPERT DISCOVERY filed by Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 9/12/2014) Modified on 9/15/2014 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 310 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-7-14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (309 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/9/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 10, 2014 309 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 9, 2014 308 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY ROBERT R. GILMAN PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (306) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (283) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (286) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (270) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (285) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 307 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 9, 2014 306 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Robert R. Gilman ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8906416.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gilman, Robert) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
September 8, 2014 305 DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint /ADAPTIX, INC.'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
September 5, 2014 304 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING-IN-PART 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. The motion is granted except as to Exhibit Z (Docket No. 300-6). No timely supporting declaration was filed as to this exhibit. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 27, 2014 303 Declaration of Fred I. Williams in Support of 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 300 ) (Powell, Michael) (Filed on 8/27/2014)
August 26, 2014 302 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/26/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re Plaintiff's Motion to Correct an Asserted Patent (Dkt. Nos. 247 in CV13-01776, 270 in -01777, 247 in -01778, 240 in -01844 & 249 in -02023) AND Defendants' Motion to Strike Adaptix's Reliance Upon ATTM Documents (Dkt. Nos. 297 in CV13-01777, 274 in -01778 & 277 in -02023): The court grants Defendants' Motion to Strike. The court takes Plaintiff's Motion to Correct Asserted Patent under submission; written order to be issued. The court will issue a new settlement referral in CV14-01259 PSG Adaptix, Inc. v. Dell, Inc., et al. in light of order of recusal recently entered by Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/26/2014)
August 22, 2014 301 EXHIBITS re 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 300 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 22, 2014 300 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Michael Ercolini ISO Motion to Seal, # 2 Proposed Order Motion to Seal, # 3 Supplement Letter Brief, # 4 Declaration Michael Ercolini ISO Motion to Strike, # 5 Exhibit Y, # 6 Exhibit Z, # 7 Proposed Order Motion to Strike, # 8 Supplement Letter)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2014)
August 21, 2014 299 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING TIME ON AUGUST 26, 2014 MOTIONS: 8/26/2014 10:00 AM Motions (In Re: Docket Nos. 247 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 270 & 297 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 247 & 274 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 240 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 249 & 277 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) reset to 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2014)
August 18, 2014 298 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 294 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 15, 2014 297 Discovery Letter Brief re 295 Motion for Hearing by Teleconference on August 26, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute Regarding Reliance on ATTM Documents by Adaptix filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Declaration of Fred I. Williams, # 3 Declaration of Christopher A. Hughes, # 4 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
August 14, 2014 Set Hearing: Discovery Hearing (In Re: Docket No. 295 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 272 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG and 274 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) set for 8/26/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 14, 2014 296 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT AUGUST 26, 2014 DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (295) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (272) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; and granting (274) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
August 13, 2014 295 MOTION to Appear by Teleconference on August 26, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/13/2014) Modified on 8/14/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2014 294 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE TIME PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 6-2 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Gina A. Bibby)(Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 8/13/2014)
August 12, 2014 293 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 291 Stipulation.(psglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2014)
August 8, 2014 292 REPLY (re 270 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 291 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Discovery Limitations Pursuant to Court's July 8 Order filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 8, 2014 290 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE re (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by Apple, Inc., Cellco Partnership, (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by HTC America Inc, AT&T Mobility LLC, HTC Corporation, (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc., (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc., (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by HTC America Inc, Apple Inc., HTC Corporation, Cellco Partnership. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 8, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2014)
August 7, 2014 289 Minute Entry: Defendants' Motion to Strike Portions of Dr. Michael Caloyannides's Expert Reports (In Re: Dkt. Nos. 254-4 in CV13-01776, 278-4 in -01777, 255-4 in -01778, 248-4 in -01844 & 257-4 in -02023) held on 8/7/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. The court takes matter under submission; written order to be issued. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/7/2014)
August 5, 2014 288 Letter Brief Concerning Defendants' Motion to Strike filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 287 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE AUGUST 7, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (286) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (263) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (267) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (256) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (265) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic hearing. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 5, 2014 286 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
August 4, 2014 Set Hearing as to as to Motion to Strike, In Re: Docket Nos. (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 4, 2014 283 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 278 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 4, 2014 282 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Foster (Foster, James) (Filed on 8/4/2014)
August 1, 2014 285 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES, granting (256) in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. 3:14-cv-02895-EDL related to 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/1/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 284 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE, granting (255) in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG. 3:14-cv-02894-PSG related to 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-cv-01386-PSG, 5:14-cv-01387-PSG, 5:14-cv-02359-PSG, 5:14-cv-02360-PSG, 5:14-cv-03112-PSG, 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG and 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 8/1/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 281 RESPONSE (re 270 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent ) and Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Opposition and Cross-Motion, # 2 Declaration of Fuja, # 3 Declaration of Selwyn, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Proposed Order)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 1, 2014 280 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/28/14, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (258 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/30/2014. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
July 30, 2014 Set Hearing as to as to Motion to Strike, In Re: Docket Nos. (254 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (278 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (255 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (248 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (257 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): Motion Hearing set for 8/7/2014 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 30, 2014 279 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT AUGUST 7, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (277) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (254) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (253) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (247) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (256) Motion in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2014)
July 29, 2014 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Letter Brief in Support of Motion to Strike filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Davis, # 2 Declaration of Powell, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Motion to Strike (Redacted), # 5 Motion to Strike (Sealed), # 6 Declaration of Hughes, # 7 Exhibit 1, # 8 Exhibit 1 (Sealed), # 9 Exhibit 2, # 10 Exhibit 3, # 11 Exhibit 3 (Sealed), # 12 Exhibit 4, # 13 Exhibit 4 (Sealed), # 14 Exhibit 5, # 15 Exhibit 5 (Sealed), # 16 Exhibit 6, # 17 Exhibit 6 (Sealed), # 18 Exhibit 7 (Proposed Order))(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 29, 2014 277 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 8/12/2014. Replies due by 8/19/2014. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
July 28, 2014 276 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/28/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Adaptix's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Preliminary Infringement Contentions (Dkt. Nos. 237 in CV13-01776, 263 in -01777, 238 in -01778, 230 in -01844 & 243 in -02023). The court denies Adaptix's Motion for Leave to Amend Its Infringement Contentions. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2014)
July 28, 2014 275 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING ONE-WEEK EXTENSION OF EXPERT DISCOVERY by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (273) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (248) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (249) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (241) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (252) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2014)
July 24, 2014 274 Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to 269 Adaptix, Inc.'s Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark D. Selwyn, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 7/24/2014)
July 22, 2014 273 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding One-Week Extension of Expert Discovery filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 272 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FOR JULY 28, 2014 MOTION HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (271) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG and (250) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 22, 2014 271 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the July 28, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 7/22/2014)
July 18, 2014 270 MOTION to Amend/Correct an Asserted Patent filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Responses due by 8/1/2014. Replies due by 8/8/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of James Foster in Support of Plaintiff's Motion, # 9 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 7/18/2014)
July 17, 2014 269 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 268 EXHIBITS re 227 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, /Public Filing of Exhibit A to the Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Related document(s) 227 ) (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 267 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING AUGUST 19, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: 8/19/2014 Case Management Conference is reset to 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 17, 2014 266 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Case Management Statement due by 8/12/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 16, 2014 265 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Peter J. Shen (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 7/16/2014)
July 10, 2014 Set Hearing: Motion for Leave to Amend Preliminary Infringement Contentions set for 7/28/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 264 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING ADAPTIX INC.'S MOTION FOR TELECONFERENCE TO RESOLVE ADAPTIX'S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS PRELIMINARY INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (263) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (238) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (237) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (230) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (243) Motion for Hearing in case 5:13-cv- 02023-PSG: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 10, 2014 263 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference to Resolve Adaptix's Request for Leave to Amend its Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 8, 2014 262 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (In Re: Docket Nos. 229 in 13-01776, 232 in -01777, 223 in -01778, 215 in -01844 & 212 in -02023): The court grants Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Parties to meet & confer regarding necessary additional discovery related to the unclean hands defense. If no agreement can be reached, parties to submit a joint, 5 page letter brief to the court outlining remaining disputes. The court will then resolve any outstanding disputes based on the brief. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:50 to 5:11) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/8/2014)
July 7, 2014 261 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina Ann Bibby (Bibby, Gina) (Filed on 7/7/2014)
July 3, 2014 260 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE FOR THE JULY 8, 2014 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER HEARING, granting (259) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (235) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (234) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (227) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (239) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 259 MOTION to Appear by Telephone For The July 8, 2014 Hearing filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 25, 2014 258 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motions, Continuing MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, (232 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG), (223 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG), (215 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) and (212 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG): 7/1/2014 Motions are continued to 7/8/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014)
June 24, 2014 257 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JAMES C. WILLIAMS PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 240 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 256 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JENNIFER C. TEMPESTA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 239 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 255 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY KURT M. PANKRATZ PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 238 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 254 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY DOUGLAS M. KUBEHL PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 237 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 24, 2014 253 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT AT&T MOBILITY LLC'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT JULY 1, 2014 HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 252 : Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 23, 2014 252 MOTION to Appear by Telephone for the July 1, 2014 Hearing filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 23, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (232 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File, (223 in 5:13-cv-01778-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer, (215 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File, (212 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
June 13, 2014 251 REPLY (re 232 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/13/2014) Modified on 6/20/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2014 250 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JONATHAN B. RUBENSTEIN by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 248 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 13, 2014 249 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JOHNSON KUNCHERIA PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 247 . (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2014)
June 12, 2014 248 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8689547.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Rubenstein, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 247 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8687182.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kuncheria, Johnson) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
June 6, 2014 246 RESPONSE (re 232 MOTION for Leave to File ) filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 6/6/2014)
June 5, 2014 243 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryant Carroll Boren, Jr for Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC (Boren, Bryant) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 5, 2014 242 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Vensel Swenson for Defendant AT&T Mobile LLC (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 4, 2014 245 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY ELLIOTT HOOLE by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (241) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (227) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (228) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (218) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (221) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 244 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR A ONE-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR ADAPTIX TO SERVE FINAL AMENDED PRIVILEGE LOG by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (234) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (189) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (225) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (225) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (216) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (214) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 241 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER /Joint Stipulation Regarding Deposition of Non-Party Elliott Hoole filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 240 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667685.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Williams, James) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 239 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667656.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Tempesta, Jennifer) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 238 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667620.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pankratz, Kurt) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 237 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8667534.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kubehl, Douglas) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 235 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 05/16/14, before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting; Tara Bauer, Telephone number (858) 453-7590; echoreporting@yahoo.com. Tape Number: FTR 10:00 - 10:44. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/25/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2014. (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 4, 2014 234 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Privilege Log filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael James Ercolini, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/4/2014)
June 3, 2014 236 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (187) Motion to Relate Case in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. 4:14-CV-02359-KAW and 3:14-cv-02360 JCS RELATED to 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG, 5:14-cv-01259-PSG, 5:14-cv-01379-PSG, 5:14-cv-01380-PSG, 5:14-cv-01385-PSG, 5:14-01386-PSG and 5:14-cv-01387-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 233 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Adaptix's Amended Privilege Log filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 6/3/2014)
June 3, 2014 232 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer re 227 Order Denying on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,, Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 225 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 227 ) (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 6/3/2014) Modified on 6/5/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 231 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEPOSITION OF NON-PARTY QUALCOMM INCORPORATED by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting (229) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (185) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (221) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (220) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (213) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (210) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 230 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/2/2014) TRANSCRIBER: EchoReporting. Modified on 6/2/2014 (sp, COURT STAFF).
May 30, 2014 229 STIPULATION WITH (PROPOSED) ORDER Regarding Deposition of Non-Party Qualcomm Incorporated filed by Apple, Inc. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/30/2014) Modified on 6/2/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 228 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Production of Metadata (Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 227 Featured Case ORDER DENYING 225 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 79-5, a party looking to seal documents is required to submit a declaration establishing that the documents are in fact sealable. In addition, the request must be narrowly tailored. A declaration from outside counsel simply saying it is so does not meet this standard. In addition, the request must be narrowly tailored. A cursory review of the materials at issue in the pending motions shows portions that plainly are not sealable. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 27, 2014 226 Letter Brief re 219 Discovery Letter Brief Compelling Production of Certain Documents with Their Metadata filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 219 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 23, 2014 225 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit)(Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 5/23/2014)
May 16, 2014 224 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 5/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:00 to 10:44) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/16/2014)
May 16, 2014 223 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Amend Infringement Contentions)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 5/16/2014)
May 12, 2014 222 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 220 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 9, 2014 Set Hearing as to 219 Discovery Letter Brief Compelling Production of Certain Documents with Their Metadata. Motion to Compel set for 5/29/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 221 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 220 MOTION to Appear by Telephone on May 29, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. Pacific to Resolve a Discovery Dispute filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 219 Discovery Letter Brief Compelling Production of Certain Documents with Their Metadata filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 218 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (202) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (170) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (198) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (200) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (189) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (183) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
May 9, 2014 217 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/9/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: Defendants Apple, Inc., AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership d/b/a Verizon Wireless, HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions (Dkt. Nos 170-3 in -1774, 200-3 in -1776, 202-3 in -1777, 198-3 in -1778, 189-3 in -1844 & 183-3 in -2023) AND Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel (Dkt. Nos. 207 in -1776, 210 in -1777 & 191 in -2023). The Court grants Defendants' Motion for Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions. Defendant Apple, Inc.'s Motion to Compel is granted. (Court Reporter: Summer Fisher) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/9/2014)
May 8, 2014 216 EXHIBITS re 206 Order on Motion for Leave to File 197 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 178 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Filing of Exhibit 2, # 2 Public Filing of Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 206 , 197 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2014 215 EXHIBITS re 206 Order on Motion for Leave to File 197 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Public Filing of Documents from Dkt. No. 180 filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Public Filing of Defendants' Motion for Teleconference, # 2 Public Filing of Exhibit 2, # 3 Public Filing of Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 206 , 197 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/8/2014) Modified on 5/9/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2014 214 Letter Brief re 210 Letter Brief, Concerning Production of Email by Adaptix filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Related document(s) 210 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 7, 2014 213 Letter Brief re 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 202 ) (Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 5/7/2014)
May 5, 2014 212 CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING TIME ON MAY 9, 2014 MOTIONS: 5/9/2014 5:00 PM Motions are advanced to 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 2, 2014 211 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 209 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 30, 2014 Set Hearing re 210 Letter Brief: Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2014 at 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 210 Letter Brief re 209 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on May 9, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute Regarding Production of Email by Adaptix filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 209 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 209 MOTION to Appear by Telephone on May 9, 2014 at 5:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/30/2014) Modified text on 4/30/2014,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 30, 2014 208 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on April 16, 2014, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com. Tape Number: FTR4:45-6:04. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/21/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 30, 2014 207 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Liao for Apple Inc. (Liao, Andrew) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 29, 2014 206 Featured Case ORDER DENYING LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (205) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (172) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (200) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (202) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (191) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (186) Motion for Leave to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 28, 2014 205 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Orders Denying Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Ercolini, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 28, 2014 204 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT MAY 9, 2014 MOTION HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 203 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 26, 2014 Set Hearing as to 202 -3 Letter Brief Seeking Leave to Supplement Invalidity Contentions: Hearing set for 5/9/2014 at 5:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2014)
April 26, 2014 203 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/26/2014)
April 26, 2014 202 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Letter Brief, # 4 Exhibit A (Sealed Document), # 5 Declaration, # 6 Proposed Order)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/26/2014)
April 25, 2014 Remarks: Attorneys Michael B Powell, Robert Macaulay Pollaro and Howard Wizenfeld status changed to Pro Hac Vice re Order (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 24, 2014 201 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS FOR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (64) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (65) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01387-PSG; granting (66) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (67) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (68) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (69) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01386-PSG; granting (67) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (68) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:14-cv-01380-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014) Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/25/2014 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2014 200 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by AT&T Mobility LLC for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 18, 2014 199 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC /Proof of Service of Rule 26(a)(1) Second Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement of AT&T Mobility LLC (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
April 17, 2014 198 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (131) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (132) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (134) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (175) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (176) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (177) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (139) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (141) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (173) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (125) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (126) Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting (128) Motion for Pro Hac Vice in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 197 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; denying (147) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (149) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; denying (178) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (180) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; denying (165) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (166) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; denying (161) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (163) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 17, 2014 196 Featured Case ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTES by Judge Paul S. Grewalgranting in part and denying in part (184) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (153) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (179) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (181) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (179) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (185) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (167) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (171) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (176) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting in part and denying in part (162) Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part (167) Discovery Letter Brief in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2014)
April 16, 2014 195 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2014 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal re: 1.) Motion to Compel Privilege Logs (In Re: Docket Nos. 147-3 in -1774, 178-3 in -1776, 188 in -1777, 186 in -1778, 176 in -1844 and 171 in -2023. 2.) Motion to Compel Matthew Vella for Deposition (In Re: Docket Nos. 149-3 in -1774, 180-3 in -1776, 180-3 in -1777, 180-3 in -1778, 166-3 in -1844 and 163-3 in -2023. 3.) Motion to Modify the Court's Case Management Order and Supplemental Scheduling Order (In Re: Docket Nos. 153 in -1774, 185 in -1776, 184 in -1777, 181 in -1778, 171 in -1844 and 167 in -2023. Court to issue written order. (Court Reporter FTR: (4:45 to 6:04) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/16/2014)
April 15, 2014 194 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING APRIL 10, 2014 RELATED CASE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 5/16/2014 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 5/9/2014. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing (Dkt. 188 ) set for 4/16/2014 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 15, 2014 192 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY by Judge Paul S. Grewal, granting 189 . Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2014)
April 14, 2014 191 Letter Brief re 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Related document(s) 178 , 180 ) (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 190 RESPONSE (re 184 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents ) filed byAT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 14, 2014 189 Motion for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 188 filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/14/2014) Modified on 4/14/2014,(incorrect event selected.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2014 188 Letter Brief Concerning Request for an Order to Compel Plaintiff Adaptix to Amend Multiple Privilege Logs filed byAT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 10, 2014 193 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER CASES RELATED. Case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG related to 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; 5:13- cv-01778-PSG; 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; 5:13-cv-02023-PSG; 5:14-cv-01259-PSG; 3:14-cv-01379-JSW; 3:14-cv-01380-EMC; 3:14-cv-01385-SI; 3:14-cv-01386-YGR; and 3:14-cv-01387-JST. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 4/10/2014. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 10, 2014 187 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Jennifer Lu Gilbert (Gilbert, Jennifer) (Filed on 4/10/2014)
April 8, 2014 186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. for Unredacted Copies of Sealed Filings (Davis, Craig) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 185 CLERK'S NOTICE Setting Motion Hearing, Setting Hearing as to 184 Discovery Letter Brief CORRECTED Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2014 at 04:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 184 Discovery Letter BriefCORRECTION to 179 Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/8/2014) Modified on 4/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2014 183 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING, Setting Hearing as to (149 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Mr. Vella, (147 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, (148 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (180 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella(178 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, (179 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (179 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (180 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, (178 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, (167 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (165 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Privilege Logs, (166 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Mr. Vella, (162 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Discovery Letter Brief Concerning Adaptix's Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order and to Compel Production of Witnesses and Documents, (163 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, (161 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs. Hearing set for 4/16/2014 at 4:45 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 8, 2014 182 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (181) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (150) Motion in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (181) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (164) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 181 MOTION for Teleconference to Resolve Discovery Dispute re 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs filed by Apple, Inc.. Responses due by 4/21/2014. Replies due by 4/28/2014. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/7/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 180 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, # 4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Deposition of Matthew Vella, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4, # 11 Exhibit 5, # 12 Exhibit 6, # 13 Exhibit 7, # 14 Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9, # 16 Public Redacted Version of Motion for Teleconference, # 17 Unredacted Version of Motion for Teleconference)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 7, 2014 179 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 184 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 4/7/2014) Modified on 4/8/2014 (cv, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2014 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis in Support of Apple's Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Public Redacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, # 4 Unredacted Version of Letter Brief Concerning Adaptixs Privilege Logs, # 5 Exhibit 1, # 6 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, # 8 Exhibit 3, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Public Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, # 15 Exhibit 9)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 31, 2014 177 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8493585.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Powell, Michael) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 176 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8493085.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pollaro, Robert) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 31, 2014 175 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice /Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8493037.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Wizenfeld, Howard) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 28, 2014 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis Marc Jensen on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Jensen, Travis) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 28, 2014 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Bas de Blank on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (de Blank, Bas) (Filed on 3/28/2014)
March 26, 2014 172 Featured Case ORDER RE: NOTICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION TO COMPEL (171 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc., (145 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (162 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Cellco Partnership, (144 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (170 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (175 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (161 in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (152 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Stipulation filed by Adaptix, Inc., (153 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Notice (Other) filed by Apple, Inc.. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on March 26, 2014. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 171 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. re 167 Letter Brief, Withdrawing Letter Brief Concerning Motion to Compel Production of Documents (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 26, 2014 170 STIPULATION re 167 Letter Brief, Motion to Compel filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2014)
March 25, 2014 169 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 164 MOTION FOR PRO HACE VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
March 25, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing re (172 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG) Letter Brief, (149 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) Letter Brief, (167 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) Letter Brief, Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 04:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
March 24, 2014 168 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT MARCH 28, 2014 DISCOVERY HEARING by Judge Paul S. Grewal: Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 17, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to (171 in 5:13-cv-01776-PSG), (166 in 5:13-cv-01777-PSG) and (148 in 5:13-cv-02023-PSG) MOTION for Hearing to Resolve Discovery Dispute: Motion Hearing set for 3/28/2014 at 4:00 PM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 167 Letter Brief re 166 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on March 28, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed byApple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Apple's Requests for Production to Adaptix, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Verizon's Requests for Production to Adaptix, # 3 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 166 ) (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 17, 2014 166 MOTION for Hearing by Teleconference on March 28, 2014 at 4:00 p.m. Pacific to Resolve Discovery Dispute filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 14, 2014 165 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc. of Related Case Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order)(Davis, Craig) (Filed on 3/14/2014)
March 4, 2014 164 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. Fulford ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8422776.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service Certificate of Good Standing)(Fulford, Thomas) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 24, 2014 163 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 162 STIPULATION entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
February 21, 2014 162 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO COMPLETE MEDIATION filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John Moehringer)(Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 2/21/2014)
February 20, 2014 161 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE MEDIATION by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (160) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (135) Motion Extend Time for Mediation; granting (136) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (166) Stipulation; granting (167) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (153) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (142) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Order, # 2 Stipulated Order) (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 20, 2014 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend the Deadline to Complete Mediation filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/20/2014)
February 10, 2014 159 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (133) Motion for Protective Order in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG. Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
February 6, 2014 158 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Supplemental Protective Order re Qualcomm filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Protective Order re Qualcomm)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 4, 2014 157 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING FEBRUARY 18, 2014 SETTLEMENT REFERRAL AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE NANDOR VADAS: 2/18/2014 Scheduling Conference before Magistrate Judge Nandor Vadas is hereby vacated. Scheduling conference to proceed in 5:13-cv-01844-PSG ONLY. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
February 3, 2014 156 CLERKS NOTICE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
February 3, 2014 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2014)
January 16, 2014 155 Transcript of Electronically Recorded Proceedings held on December 19, 2013, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Transcriber Raynee H. Mercado, Telephone number 510-502-6175, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Tape Number: FTR 9:57-12:04, 1:01-2:18, 2:57-3:01. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2014. (rhm) (Filed on 1/16/2014)
January 8, 2014 154 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/18/2013, before Judge Paul S. Gewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Gina Galvan Colin, Telephone number 408 888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/29/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2014. (sp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
December 19, 2013 153 Featured Case CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on December 19, 2013. (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 152 Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 12/19/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court issues constructions from the bench. Court to issue written order. Written opinion will follow. (Court Reporter FTR: (9:57 to 12:04; 1:01 to 2:18; 2:57 to 3:01) (ofrS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/19/2013)
December 18, 2013 151 Minute Entry: Tutorial Hearing held on 12/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal (Court Reporter: Gina Galvan Colin.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/18/2013)
December 16, 2013 150 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal granting 149 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
December 13, 2013 149 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Anthony Miele ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8228558.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Miele, Anthony) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
November 25, 2013 148 Reply Claim Construction Brief filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 11/25/2013) Modified on 11/29/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2013 147 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Responsive Brief filed by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Craig E. Davis, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 146 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING MODIFICATION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (145) in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (112) in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (152) in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (146) in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (136) in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (127) in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 15, 2013 145 MOTION re 142 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Unopposed Notice of Correction filed by Adaptix, Inc.. Responses due by 12/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
November 15, 2013 144 Transcript of Proceedings of the Official Electronic Sound Recording held on August 6, 2013, before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Candace Yount, Telephone number 415-994-5619; Email address: candace.yount@yahoo.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2014. (djc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2013)
October 22, 2013 143 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byAdaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 7 Exhibit F to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, # 8 Exhibit G to Declaration of Kevin Gannon ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
October 17, 2013 142 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFING PERIOD by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (107) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG.Associated Cases: 5:13-cv-01774-PSG, 5:13-cv-01776-PSG, 5:13-cv-01777-PSG, 5:13-cv-01778-PSG, 5:13-cv-01844-PSG, 5:13-cv-02023-PSG(psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 141 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Claim Construction Briefs filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 8, 2013 140 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent L.R. 4-3 [JOINT] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 3, 2013 139 Transcript of Proceedings held on 9-20-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/2/2014. (las, ) (Filed on 10/3/2013)
October 2, 2013 138 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (137) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (101) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (144) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (131) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (126) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (114) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 1, 2013 137 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement [UNOPPOSED] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael J. Ercolini In Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 20, 2013 136 Minute Entry: Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions (90 in 5:13-cv-01774-PSG) and Hearing as to Defendants' Proposed Amendments to Scheduling Order held on 9/20/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: The court grants Plaintiffs Motion to Supplement Infringement Contentions. Tutorial continued to 12/18/13 at 10:00 in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Claims Construction Hearing continued to 12/19/13 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court to issue amended scheduling order. (Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 135 Featured Case ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on September 20, 2013. (psglc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 20, 2013 134 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Kevin Gannon ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-8017995.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Gannon, Kevin) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 9, 2013 133 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference (In Re: Docket Nos. 82 , 83 and 84 ) set for 9/20/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Parties are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2013)
September 6, 2013 132 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7982532.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Ercolini, Michael) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
September 4, 2013 131 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7974874.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(DeBlois, Jonathan) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 3, 2013 130 Letter from Defendants Regarding Adaptix's Objections to Scheduling Proposal. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
August 30, 2013 129 Opposition to Defendants' 128 Proposed Amendments to Scheduling Orders by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 8/30/2013) Modified on 8/30/2013,(to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 128 Proposed Order of Defendants to Amend Scheduling Order by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 22, 2013 127 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 125 MOTION FOR PRO HACE VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
August 22, 2013 126 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 22, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
August 21, 2013 125 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7941760.) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Diaz, Samiyah) (Filed on 8/21/2013)
August 14, 2013 124 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 123 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 122 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 14, 2013 121 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURE FOR RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY AND OTHER NON-DISPOSITIVE DISPUTES. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on August 14, 2013. (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2013)
August 13, 2013 120 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
August 13, 2013 119 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCKET ENTRY 120***Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-16-13, before Judge Paul S. Grewal. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Transcriber, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2013) Modified on 8/13/2013 (sp, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2013 118 Minute Entry: Status Conference held. Court to issue order after hearing. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:05 to 10:28.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/6/2013)
August 6, 2013 117 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Supplemental Scheduling Order, # 2 Proposed Order Electronic Discovery, # 3 Proposed Order Dispute Resolution Procedure, # 4 Proposed Order Protective Order)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 8/6/2013)
July 30, 2013 116 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AT&T Mobility LLC / Proof of Service of Rule 26(a)1 Supplemental Initial Disclosure Statement of AT&T Mobility LLC (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
July 25, 2013 114 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel and Request for Removal from ECF (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 115 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Tutorial Hearing set for 11/6/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/8/2013 at 10:00 AM (SPECIAL SET) in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Jury Trial set for 2/9/2015 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 7/24/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 23, 2013 113 NOTICE of Change of Address by Paul J. Hayes, Esq and Change of Firm Affiliation (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 16, 2013 112 Minute Entry: Case Management Conference held on 7/16/2013 before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal: Case management scheduling order to be issued. Status conference set for 8/6/2013 at 10:00 AM to discuss structure of initial trial as set forth in schedule and to discuss motion practice. Counsel requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (Court Reporter FTR: (10:03 to 11:07.) (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/16/2013)
July 9, 2013 111 Amended Certificate of Interested Entities by Adaptix, Inc. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 110 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 9, 2013 109 *** POSTED IN ERROR *** please see 111 Certificate of Interested Entities by Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
July 9, 2013 108 Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 7/9/2013) Modified on 7/10/2013 (cv, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2013 107 Certificate of Interested Entities by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent SBC Long Distance, LLC, Corporate Parent SBC Telecom, Inc., Corporate Parent BellSouth Mobile Data, Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 26, 2013 106 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Private ADR, granting 105 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Adaptix, Inc. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on 6/26/2013. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013)
June 25, 2013 105 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Adaptix, Inc. filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 104 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 103 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 19, 2013 102 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options By Parties and Counsel (Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 6/19/2013)
June 12, 2013 101 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 76 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 100 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 75 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 12, 2013 99 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting 74 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 10, 2013 98 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 88 MOTION FOR PRO HACE VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 10, 2013 97 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 86 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE entered by Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
June 10, 2013 96 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge Paul S. Grewal granting (95) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01777-PSG; granting (53) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01774-PSG; granting (95) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01778-PSG; granting (91) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01776-PSG; granting (84) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-01844-PSG; granting (67) Stipulation in case 5:13-cv-02023-PSG (psglc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
June 6, 2013 95 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jonathan Hardt in Support of Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 4, 2013 94 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Conference set for 6/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal. Case Management Statement due by 6/18/2013. ***This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice.*** (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 93 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on June 4, 2013. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 92 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING RELATED CASES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/4/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 91 NOTICE of Change of Address by Daniel McArtur Shafer (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 90 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins, Hon. Jon S. Tigar, Hon. Edward M. Chen, Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 6/3/13. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
June 3, 2013 89 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 30, 2013 88 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Paul J. Hayes, [Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-7736054] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Hayes, Paul) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 87 CLERK'S NOTICE correcting time of case management conference. The Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2013 will be held at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 30, 2013 86 APPLICATION for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice of Steven E. Lipman, [Filing Fee: $305.00, receipt number 0971-7735833] filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lipman, Steven) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 85 Statement re 81 Order; /Plaintiff's Statement in Response to Notice of Pending Motion to Relate Cases filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 84 NOTICE filed by Apple, Inc.; Notice of Support for Administrative Motion to Relate Cases and Notice of Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 83 Statement re 81 Order; /Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Statement in Response to Court's 5/20/13 Notice of Pending Motion to Relate Cases and Notice of Consent to Magistrate Judge by AT&T Mobility LLC filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 20, 2013 82 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2013 at 2:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order, # 2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 20, 2013 81 Notice of pending motion to relate cases. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 05/20/2013. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
May 17, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/17/13. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013)
May 16, 2013 79 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 16, 2013. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 16, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/16/13. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 77 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013)
May 15, 2013 76 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7703077.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Moehringer, John) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 75 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7701764.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Lutz, Regina) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 74 MOTION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7701699.) filed by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Hughes, Christopher) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2013 73 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Apple, Inc... (Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 10, 2013 72 Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice- Hardt.(knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2013)
May 8, 2013 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Hardt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7686023.) filed by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Hardt, Jonathan) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 8, 2013 70 CLERKS NOTICE REQUESTING ALL PARTIES FILE CONSENT OR DECLINATION BY NO LATER THAN 5/22/2013. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2013)
May 7, 2013 69 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Adaptix, Inc... (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 2, 2013 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel McArtur Shafer for Adaptix, Inc. (Shafer, Daniel) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Cheng-hong Lin for Adaptix, Inc. (Lin, Richard) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 2, 2013 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Banys for Adaptix, Inc. (Banys, Christopher) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
May 1, 2013 65 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 19, 2013 64 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2013. Case Management Conference set for 7/16/2013 10:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 63 Letter from Clerk re new case number in this Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 19, 2013 62 Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:12-cv-00125. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 18, 2013 Interdistrict transfer to the Northern District of California. (mll, )
April 17, 2013 61 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven E Lipman on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Lipman, Steven)
April 3, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER VACATING 49 Order of Consolidation. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 04/03/13. cc:attys 4-04-13(mll, )
March 28, 2013 This civil action will be transferred to the Northern District of California on or after 4-17-2013 per Local Rule CV-83(b). (mll, )
March 28, 2013 59 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 40 Motion to Change Venue. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. Signed by Judge Michael H. Schneider on 03/28/13. cc:attys 3-28-13 (mll, )
January 15, 2013 58 Order reassigning this case to United States District Judge Michael H. Schneider per General Order 13-3. Please see Appendix D: Addendum Regarding Cases Assigned to Judge Schneider. Judge Leonard Davis no longer assigned to the case. (mjc, )
November 27, 2012 57 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 41 Motion for Discovery/Docket Control Order. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 11/27/12. cc:attys 11-27-12 (mll, )
October 22, 2012 56 SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
October 19, 2012 55 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. NOTICE OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Smith, Melissa)
October 12, 2012 54 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC re 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) Notice of Correction Regarding Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Williams, Fred)
October 11, 2012 53 NOTICE by Apple, Inc. OF JOINDER IN DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) (Smith, Melissa)
October 11, 2012 52 NOTICE by AT&T Mobility LLC Joinder In Defendants Reply In Support Of Their Motion To Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a) (Williams, Fred)
September 24, 2012 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Bostock Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A to Bostock Decl, # 3 Exhibit B to Bostock Decl, # 4 Exhibit C to Bostock Decl, # 5 Exhibit D to Bostock Decl, # 6 Exhibit E to Bostock Decl, # 7 Exhibit F to Bostock Decl, # 8 Exhibit G to Bostock Decl, # 9 Exhibit H to Bostock Decl, # 10 Exhibit I to Bostock Decl, # 11 Exhibit J to Bostock Decl, # 12 Exhibit K to Bostock Decl, # 13 Affidavit Lee Declaration)(Bostock, Dean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/1/2012: # 14 Text of Proposed Order) (gsg, ).
September 20, 2012 50 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures (Smith, Melissa)
September 11, 2012 This civil action is CONSOLIDATED with cause 6:12cv016 designated as the Lead Case. All future pleadings -- except relating to venue -- are to be filed in the Lead Case. This case remains active for venue determination and trial. (mll, )
September 11, 2012 49 Featured Case ORDER consolidating the following civil actions:6:12cv016 Adaptix Inc v. Motorola Mobility LLC6:12cv017 Adaptix Inc v. AT&T Inc6:12cv019 Adaptix Inc v. AT&T Inc, et al6:12cv020 Adaptix Inc v. Pantech Wireless Inc, et al6:12cv120 Adaptix Inc v. Cellco Partnership, et al6:12cv121 Adaptix Inc v. Cellco Partnership, et al6:12cv124 Adaptix Inc v. Apple Inc, et al6:12cv125 Adaptix Inc v. Apple Inc, et alThe above civil actions are CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues except venue with the first-filed action, Cause No. 6:12-cv-16 designated as the Lead Case. All parties are instructed to file any future motions except relating to venue in the Lead Case. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. Motions to transfer venue will be considered only as to the defendants in the individual cases. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. All parties to the consolidated case are ordered to meet-and-confer to discuss the entry of a uniform docket control, protective and discovery orders, which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. All major dates including Markman and trial dates will remain the same for the consolidated case as they were assigned in the individual cases. The parties are ordered to submit proposed uniform docket control, protective, and discovery orders for the consolidated case by 9-21-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/11/12. cc:attys 9-12-12(mll, )
September 10, 2012 48 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by AT&T Mobility LLC (Clonts, David)
September 10, 2012 47 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Apple, Inc. (Smith, Melissa)
September 10, 2012 46 NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Adaptix, Inc. pursuant to Paragraph 2c of the Discovery Order (Hill, Jack)
September 6, 2012 45 Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control Order by Adaptix, Inc. (Hill, Jack)
September 4, 2012 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a); Responses due by 9/24/2012. The Court will not grant any further extensions absent a showing of good cause. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 09/04/12. cc:attys 9-04-12 (mll, )
August 30, 2012 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
August 21, 2012 42 Featured Case DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/21/12. cc:attys 8-22-12(mll, )
August 20, 2012 41 Joint MOTION for Discovery Motion for Entry of Discovery and Docket Control Orders by AT&T Mobility LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Discovery Control Order, # 2 Exhibit Docket Control Order)(Williams, Fred) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/22/2012: # 3 Corrected Proposed DCO, # 4 Corrected Proposed Discovery Order) (gsg, ).
August 13, 2012 40 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1404(a) by AT&T Mobility LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Hardt Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A - Hardt Decl., # 3 Exhibit B - Hardt Decl., # 4 Exhibit C - Hardt Decl., # 5 Exhibit D - Hardt Decl., # 6 Exhibit E - Hardt Decl., # 7 Exhibit F - Hardt Decl., # 8 Exhibit G - Hardt Decl., # 9 Exhibit H - Hardt Decl., # 10 Exhibit I - Hardt Decl., # 11 Exhibit J - Hardt Decl., # 12 Exhibit K - Hardt Decl., # 13 Exhibit L - Hardt Decl., # 14 Exhibit M - Hardt Decl., # 15 Exhibit N - Hardt Decl., # 16 Exhibit O - Hardt Decl., # 17 Exhibit P - Hardt Decl., # 18 Exhibit Q - Hardt Decl., # 19 Exhibit R - Hardt Decl., # 20 Exhibit S - Hardt Decl., # 21 Exhibit T - Hardt Decl., # 22 Exhibit U - Hardt Decl., # 23 Exhibit V - Hardt Decl., # 24 Exhibit W - Hardt Decl., # 25 Exhibit X - Hardt Decl., # 26 Exhibit Y - Hardt Decl., # 27 Affidavit Buckley (Apple) Declaration, # 28 Affidavit Motorola Mobility Declaration, # 29 Affidavit Nagomoto (LG) Declaration, # 30 Affidavit Bariault (HTC) Declaration, # 31 Exhibit Kim (Pantech) Declaration, # 32 Affidavit Stone (Verizon) Declaration, # 33 Affidavit AT&T Declaration, # 34 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa)
August 8, 2012 39 Featured Case ORDER that parties are to submit agreed Docket Control and Discovery Orders to the Court by 08-20-2012. For purposes of computing the time deadlines under the local patent rules, the Court deems 08-20-2012 as the effective Rule 16 Initial Case Management Conference date, and thus plaintiff's PR 3-1 and 3-2 disclosures will be due 08-10-2012. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 8/08/12. cc:attys 8-09-12 (mll, )
August 6, 2012 38 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Leonard Davis: Status Conference held on 8/6/2012. (Court Reporter Shea Sloan.) (Attachments: # 1 Attorney Sign-In Sheets) (rlf)
August 3, 2012 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Craig Evan Davis on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Davis, Craig)
July 17, 2012 36 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Cronin on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Cronin, Paul)
July 11, 2012 35 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James C Hall on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hall, James)
July 11, 2012 34 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dean G Bostock on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Bostock, Dean)
July 11, 2012 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul J Hayes on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Hayes, Paul)
July 5, 2012 32 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jack Wesley Hill (Hill, Jack)
June 13, 2012 31 Featured Case ORDER setting Status Conference for 8/6/2012 01:30 PM before Judge Leonard Davis. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 06/13/12. cc:attys 6-14-12(mll, )
May 30, 2012 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Hardt on behalf of Apple, Inc. (Hardt, Jonathan)
May 30, 2012 23 ANSWER to 20 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Apple, Inc. by Adaptix, Inc..(Hill, Jack)
May 29, 2012 28 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Peter J Shen for Apple, Inc.(pkb, )
May 29, 2012 27 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James T Bailey for AT&T Mobility LLC. (pkb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2012: # 1 Exhibit) (mll, ).
May 29, 2012 26 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Regina M Lutz for AT&T Mobility LLC. (pkb, )
May 29, 2012 25 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher A Hughes for AT&T Mobility LLC. (pkb, )
May 29, 2012 24 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney John T Moehringer for AT&T Mobility LLC. (pkb, )
May 25, 2012 30 APPLICATION (APPROVED) to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark D Selwyn for Apple, Inc. (pkb, ) Modified on 5/31/2012 (pkb, ).
May 25, 2012 22 NOTICE by Adaptix, Inc. OF REQUEST FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Hill, Jack)
May 24, 2012 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Apple, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Apple, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa)
May 24, 2012 20 Apple Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Adaptix, Inc. by Apple, Inc..(Smith, Melissa)
May 24, 2012 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by AT&T Mobility LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc. for AT&T Mobility LLC. (Williams, Fred)
May 24, 2012 18 ANSWER to 1 Complaint, Defendant AT&T Mobility LLC's Answer to Adaptix, Inc.'s Original Complaint by AT&T Mobility LLC.(Williams, Fred)
May 24, 2012 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David R Clonts on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Clonts, David)
May 24, 2012 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Eric Landis on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Landis, Todd)
May 24, 2012 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Fred Irvin Williams on behalf of AT&T Mobility LLC (Williams, Fred)
May 7, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 14 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Mobility LLC to 5/24/2012. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
May 4, 2012 14 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility LLC.( Dyll, Timothy)
April 30, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 13 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 5/24/2012. 14 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 27, 2012 13 Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
April 12, 2012 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Adaptix, Inc, and dismissing all claims against deft AT&T without prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 04/12/12. cc:attys 4-12-12(mll, )
April 11, 2012 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Adaptix, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack)
April 9, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 10 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for AT&T Mobility LLC to 5/10/2012; AT&T, Inc. to 5/10/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
April 5, 2012 10 Defendants' Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc..( Gaffney, Brian)
March 28, 2012 9 Return of Service Executed as to Apple, Inc. on 3/20/2012, by cert mail. (mll, )
March 28, 2012 8 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T Mobility LLC on 3/20/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/10/2012. (mll, )
March 28, 2012 7 Return of Service Executed as to AT&T, Inc. on 3/20/2012, by cert mail; answer due: 4/10/2012. (mll, )
March 23, 2012 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint 6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Apple, Inc. to 5/10/2012. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mll, )
March 22, 2012 6 Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Apple Inc.( Smith, Melissa)
March 13, 2012 5 SUMMONS Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Apple, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, )
March 12, 2012 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Adaptix, Inc. (Ward, Thomas)
March 9, 2012 Judge Leonard Davis added. (mll, )
March 9, 2012 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Adaptix, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Corporate Parent Acacia Research Group LLC for Adaptix, Inc.. (Hill, Jack)
March 9, 2012 2 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack)
March 9, 2012 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility LLC, AT&T, Inc., Apple, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3484646.), filed by Adaptix, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US 7,454,212, # 2 Exhibit B - US 6,947,748, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hill, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adaptix, Inc. v. Apple, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility LLC
Represented By: David Randall Clonts
Represented By: James T. Bailey
Represented By: Timothy J Dyll
Represented By: Brian James Gaffney
Represented By: Christopher A. Hughes
Represented By: Todd Eric Landis
Represented By: Regina M. Lutz
Represented By: John T. Moehringer
Represented By: Fred Irvin Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Richards Smith
Represented By: Peter J Shen
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Represented By: Jonathan L Hardt
Represented By: Craig Evan Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adaptix, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel McArtur Shafer
Represented By: Steven Edward Lipman
Represented By: Richard Cheng-hong Lin
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: Paul J Hayes
Represented By: James C. Hall
Represented By: Paul J Cronin
Represented By: Dean G. Bostock
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]