Buschman v. Anesthesia Business Consultants LLC

Defendant: Anesthesia Business Consultants LLC
Plaintiff: Alan Buschman
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01787
Filed: April 19, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 16 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Alan Buschman, PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/16/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2013)
October 11, 2013 18 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Mediation Deadline filed by Anesthesia Business Consultants LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/11/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2013)
April 18, 2014 35 Featured Case ORDER to Show Cause (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2014)
May 5, 2014 41 Featured Case ORDER REGARDING APRIL 30, 2014 JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/5/2014. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
May 13, 2014 42 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 26 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2014)
July 3, 2013 9 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Alan Buschman filed by Alan Buschman, ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation is to be completed by 11/27/13. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/3/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Buschman v. Anesthesia Business Consultants LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anesthesia Business Consultants LLC
Represented By: Michael David Lisi
Represented By: Kenneth E. Keller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Buschman
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Raskin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]