Sobayo v. Public Storage et al

Plaintiff: Nathaniel Basola Sobayo
Defendant: Public Storage
Case Number: 3:2013cv01804
Filed: April 19, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending time for initial disclosures.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/2/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
July 26, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND re 9 , 19 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/26/2013) Modified on 7/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Plaintiffs complaint has been dismissed without leave to amend for failure to state a claim. Judgment is accordingly entered in favor of defendant and against plaintiff. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 7/26/2013) Modified on 7/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 15, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL 28 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
May 6, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/1/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
June 14, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS 3 4 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sobayo v. Public Storage et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Basola Sobayo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Public Storage
Represented By: Kendall Alexander Layne
Represented By: Christopher James Nevis
Represented By: Kendall Alexander Layne
Represented By: Christopher James Nevis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]