Chase v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Quiana La Nay Chase
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2013cv01816
Filed: April 22, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2013)
December 2, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO INFORM COURT WHETHER THEY CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/2/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2013)
December 3, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONSENT AND REFERRAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
December 17, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER Regarding Consent and Referral. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 17, 2013. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2013)
May 28, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 36 Objection, filed by Carolyn W. Colvin. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/28/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
July 9, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE 36 ; GRANTING COMMISSIONER LEAVE TO FILE A SUR-REPLY. Sur-reply due by 8/8/2014. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 07/09/2014. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2014)
September 12, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Kandis A. Westmore denying 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chase v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiana La Nay Chase
Represented By: Robert Chipley Weems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]