Immersa Marketing, Inc. v. Hucom Communications, Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Immersa Marketing, Inc.
Defendant: Hucom Communications, Ltd, Borna Alikhani, Taylor Hucom Design, Taylor Manufacturing Industries, Inc., Globacore, Inc. and Environment Agency-Abu Dhabi
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01859
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FORSERVICE OF PROCESS. Case Management Statement due by 1/22/2014. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/29/2014 03:00 PM. Signed by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong on 12/5/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
December 23, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong Granting 15 Ex Parte Application. The current date for service of the complaint is extended March 31, 2014. Plaintiff shall serve Defendants and file corresponding proofs of service no later than the extended date of March 31, 2014. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2013)
July 17, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/17/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Immersa Marketing, Inc. v. Hucom Communications, Ltd et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Immersa Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Marc T. Cefalu
Represented By: Courtney Marissa Crawford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hucom Communications, Ltd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borna Alikhani
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Hucom Design
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Manufacturing Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globacore, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environment Agency-Abu Dhabi
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]