Nobles v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al

Defendant: Maybelline, New York, L'Oreal USA, Inc. and Maybelline, LLC
Plaintiff: Ayanna Nobles
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01911
Filed: April 25, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
 
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 19 Featured Case *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE To the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/22/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 20 Featured Case *** ERRONEOUS ENTRY *** ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/22/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013) Modified on 8/22/2013 (mclS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/22/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
September 10, 2013 24 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/10/2013. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
October 8, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Nobles v. L'Oreal USA, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maybelline, New York
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L'Oreal USA, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maybelline, LLC
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayanna Nobles
Represented By: Reginald Von Terrell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]