Sayad v. Miller

Petitioner: Cindy Norma Sayad
Respondent: Walter Miller
Case Number: 3:2013cv01915
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 10 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/13/2013)
February 5, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
February 5, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/5/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. DENYING 4 MOTION for Hearing filed by Cindy Norma Sayad, 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Cindy Norma Sayad, GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cindy Norma Sayad. Habeas Answer or Dispositive Motion due by 9/20/2013.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/2/13. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)
September 10, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES 8 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/10/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sayad v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Cindy Norma Sayad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Walter Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.