Olivarez v. Sonoma County Sherriff's Department

Plaintiff: Lacee Olivarez
Defendant: Sonoma County Sherriff's Department
Case Number: 3:2013cv01918
Filed: April 25, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 MOTION Continue Case Management Conference Administrative Motion to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Lacee Olivarez. Case Management Statement due by 8/23/2013. Initial Case Management Conference reset for 8/30/2013 08:30 AM. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
October 2, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Responses to Motion to Dismiss 11 due by 10/11/2013. Reply, if any, due by 10/25/2013. Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/2/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
October 15, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/15/2013. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
July 31, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/31/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2014)
September 4, 2014 71 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/4/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
September 19, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING FILING OF EX PARTE APPLICATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 09/19/2014. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2014)
June 24, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/24/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
October 29, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (60 days conditional dismissal), Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/29/2014. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2014)
November 14, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/14/2014. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2014)
April 17, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 04/17/2015. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivarez v. Sonoma County Sherriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacee Olivarez
Represented By: Waukeen Quandrico McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonoma County Sherriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.