Allen v. AVT Event Technologies, Inc. et al

Defendant: AVT Event Technologies, Inc. and Hyatt Regency
Plaintiff: Rodney Allen
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01922
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT AVT'S ANSWER; AFFORDING AVT LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER; VACATING HEARING. To the extent the motion seeks an order striking the "Affirmative De fenses" section of AVT's answer, the motion is granted. In all other respects, the motion is denied. AVT's amended answer, if any, shall be filed no later than July 3, 2013. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 20, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 28, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS. The parties are referred to mediation. The deadline to complete mediation is 90 days from the date of this order, good cause for the requested additional 60 days not having been shown. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 28, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
July 30, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 7/29/13. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013)
October 21, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS' JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 21, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Allen v. AVT Event Technologies, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVT Event Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Garcia, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Regency
Represented By: Susan W. Ansberry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Allen
Represented By: Drew Franklin Teti
Represented By: Dustin Linley Collier
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]