LFG National Capital, LLC v. Alioto et al

Defendant: Joseph M. Alioto and The Alioto Law Firm
Plaintiff: LFG National Capital, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv01930
Filed: April 26, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGE ILLSTON'S STANDING ORDER (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
June 27, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ALIOTO'S MOTION TO DISMISS LFG'S COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF FEDERAL JURISDICTION 11 18 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 28, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: This action has been dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction. Judgment is entered accordingly. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/28/2013) Modified on 6/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LFG National Capital, LLC v. Alioto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Alioto
Represented By: David J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Alioto Law Firm
Represented By: David J. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LFG National Capital, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Bernard Woodring
Represented By: Jonathan C. Cross
Represented By: Scott S. Balber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.