Din v. United States Of America et al

Defendant: Gary A. Jarvis, Harry Lampiris, Regents of the University of California, United States Of America and Walter M. Holleran
Plaintiff: Wei-Hsun Din
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv01935
Filed: April 26, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 STIPULATION CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT. CONFERENCE Case Management Statement due by 11/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. RULE 12 Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/5/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 22, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 STIPULATION re: STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/22/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
October 23, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 Stipulation Continuing Hearings on 17 and 22 Motions to Dimsiss. Motion Hearing set for 2/21/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 23, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
February 24, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 STIPULATION re 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; AND 22 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)
March 18, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/18/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Din v. United States Of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary A. Jarvis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Lampiris
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter M. Holleran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wei-Hsun Din
Represented By: J. Steven Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]