Casimiro v. Holder et al

Respondent: Janet Napolitano, Eric H. Holder, Jr., John Morton and Timothy Aiken
Petitioner: Joselito Casimiro
Case Number: 3:2013cv01936
Filed: April 29, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE. Motion Hearing set for 6/19/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/6/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2013)
September 25, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIES' STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/25/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
April 29, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 5/2/2013 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2013: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service) (cl, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casimiro v. Holder et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Janet Napolitano
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Morton
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Timothy Aiken
Represented By: Rebecca Ann Falk
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joselito Casimiro
Represented By: Kevin Michael Crabtree
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]