Cunningham v. UCSF Spine Center et al

Defendant: Nuvasive Inc, UCSF Spine Center and Osteotech Inc.
Plaintiff: Lorenzo R. Cunningham
Case Number: 3:2013cv01978
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Solano
Referring Judge: PSLC CET
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Filing of In Forma Pauperis Applicatio of Payment of Filing Fee 3 5 . Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
October 8, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal with Leave to Amend. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/8/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2013)
October 24, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2013)
November 20, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/20/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
September 8, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 30 Motion to Transfer Closed Case. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2014)
October 14, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 32 Motion for Relief from Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service). (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cunningham v. UCSF Spine Center et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvasive Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCSF Spine Center
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osteotech Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo R. Cunningham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]