Amini v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Plaintiff: Behzad Amini
Case Number: 3:2013cv01984
Filed: April 30, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 17, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff has until 2/14/2014 to file motion and response to this order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/17/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
March 5, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED. Plaintiff must respond to the order to show cause and file consent or declination by 3/21/2014. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/5/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service, # 2 Consent/Declination)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
June 16, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Susan Illston. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/16/14. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2014)
August 1, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/1/2014)
August 19, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 8/19/2014) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2014: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (tfS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amini v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Behzad Amini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]