Cypress Semiconductor Corporation v. GSI Technology, Inc.

Plaintiff: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation
Defendant: GSI Technology, Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02013
Filed: May 1, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE re 101 Claim Construction Statement filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation, 100 Brief filed by GSI Technology, Inc. Denying without prejudice 92 MOTION to Stay; Motion for Partial Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 6, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 15, 2014 106 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Entry of Equipment into Court for 5-20-14 Claim Construction Hearing filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
July 29, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS OF U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,651,134 AND 7,142,477. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 28, 2014. (jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2014)
September 15, 2014 122 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 121 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Modifications to the Case Management Order filed by GSI Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 16, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
August 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 23 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Tutorial set for 4/15/2014 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/29/2014 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
December 5, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AUTHORIZING DISTRIBUTION OF THE RECORD FROM THE ITC PROCEEDING. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2013. (Attachments: # 1 Email proposal to Court)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2013)
January 31, 2014 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 56 MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answers and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff Cypress Semiconductor Corporation's Complaints for Patent Infringement in Consolidated Cases; filed by GSI Technology, Inc. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 31, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2014)
February 4, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER; ORDER ON STIPULATION CONCERNING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION SCHEDULE AND PROCEDURE re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
March 10, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING GSI'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND ITS MINNESOTA AND CALIFORNIA ANSWERS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting 56 Motion for Leave to File. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2014)
April 21, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Entry of Equipment Into the Court Per Gen'l Order 58 for the 4/29 Technology Tutorial filed by Cypress Semiconductor Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 21, 2014. (wsnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2014)
April 28, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE TO PARTIES REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2013. (jstlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2014)
April 29, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** NOTICE TO PARTIES REGARDING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND TECHNOLOGY TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/29/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation v. GSI Technology, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cypress Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Frank E Scherkenbach
Represented By: Erin Catherine Jones
Represented By: Thomas L. Halkowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSI Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Fowler
Represented By: Saori Kaji
Represented By: Alan Averell Limbach
Represented By: Timothy Lohse
Represented By: Michael Gerald Schwartz
Represented By: Gerald T. Sekimura
Represented By: Andrew P. Valentine
Represented By: Brent Kevin Yamashita
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]