Cameron et al

Trustee: John Kendall
Miscellaneous: William J. Lafferty and Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Plaintiff: Minot, LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv02018
Filed: May 1, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101 Bankruptcy
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR REHEARING OR RECONSIDERATION 10 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
March 17, 2014 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISING BANKRUPTCY APPEAL FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 18, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 3/18/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cameron et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: John Kendall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: William J. Lafferty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minot, LLC
Represented By: Cheryl Christine Rouse
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]