Mitel Networks Corporation et al v. Facebook Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mitel (Delaware), Inc. and Mitel Networks Corporation
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02073
Filed: May 7, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Scott Corley
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case
Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2013 64 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 61 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal and Consent Judgment Order filed by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel (Delaware), Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/12.13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
July 10, 2013 63 Featured Case STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 62 Featured Case CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge EDWARD M. CHEN on 7/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 8, 2013 61 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation of Dismissal and Consent Judgment Order filed by Mitel (Delaware), Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 14, 2013 60 Featured Case ORDER NOT RELATING CASES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/14/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 14, 2013 59 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/14/13. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 13, 2013 58 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
June 13, 2013 57 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Mitel (Delaware), Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.. (Fraizer, Tamara) (Filed on 6/13/2013)
May 8, 2013 55 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:12-cv-00325. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2013: # 2 Transmittal Notice) (gaS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2013 56 Featured Case ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/7/13. (gaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2013)
May 1, 2013 Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (asw)
May 1, 2013 54 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Facebook Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/1/2013. (asw)
March 27, 2013 53 Featured Case ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/27/2013. (asw)
March 4, 2013 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 51 Proposed Protective Order filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 3/4/2013. (asw)
March 1, 2013 52 REPLY BRIEF re 47 MOTION to Stay re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 32 Transcript, filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
February 27, 2013 51 PROPOSED ORDER Protective Order re 37 Proposed Order stipulated PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
February 25, 2013 50 Official Transcript of t/c held on 11/15/12 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/28/2013. (kjm)
February 19, 2013 49 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 47 MOTION to Stay re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 32 Transcript, filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 3/1/2013. (Coletti, Susan)
January 31, 2013 48 DECLARATION re 47 MOTION to Stay re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 32 Transcript, by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Caponi, Steven)
January 31, 2013 47 MOTION to Stay re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California, 32 Transcript, - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
January 16, 2013 46 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Facebook, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.(Coletti, Susan)
December 26, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Cherylyn E. Mizzo,Linda Liu Kordziel for Mitel Networks Corporation added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
December 21, 2012 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook Inc.'s Objections and Responses to Mitel Networks Corporation and Mitel (Delaware) Inc.'s First Set of Request for Production of Documents and Facebook Inc.'s Responses to Mitel Networks Corporation and Mitel (Delaware) Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
December 13, 2012 44 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiffs by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
December 12, 2012 43 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 4/15/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 12/12/2012. (dlk)
November 21, 2012 42 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mitel's First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production to Defendant by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.(Coletti, Susan)
November 21, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 37 Proposed Order filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation, Facebook Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/21/2012. (asw)
November 15, 2012 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Facebook, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1) by Facebook Inc..(Caponi, Steven)
November 15, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Conference Re: Discovery held on 11/15/2012. Discussion on the disputed item as listed in the joint agenda submission. The court ordered the parties to work out this issue on their own. (Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
November 14, 2012 40 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.(Coletti, Susan)
November 13, 2012 39 Joint Letter to The Honorable Gregory M. Sleet from Susan M. Coletti, counsel for Plaintiffs regarding Issue to be discussed at the 11-15-12 discovery teleconference - re Oral Order,. (Coletti, Susan)
November 8, 2012 Featured Case ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A DISCOVERY TELECONFERENCE (#1): A Discovery Teleconference has been set for Thursday, November 15, 2012, at 9:30 AM with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. Counsel for plaintiff(s) is directed to arrange the conference call. A Joint Agenda letter (see court website) shall be filed no later than the close of business on Tuesday, November 13, 2012. The parties shall contact chambers at (302) 573-6470. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet 11/8/2012. (ctd)
November 6, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ruffin D. Cordell, Timothy W. Riffe and Brian J. Livedalen filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 11/6/2012. (asw)
November 5, 2012 38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Ruffin D. Cordell, Timothy W. Riffe and Brian J. Livedalen - filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
November 2, 2012 37 PROPOSED ORDER - Protective Order by Facebook Inc., Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
October 31, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 36 Stipulation filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/31/2012. (asw)
October 26, 2012 36 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Submit Proposed Protective Order by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
October 18, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to October 26, 2012 filed by Facebook Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/18/2012. (asw)
October 18, 2012 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Submit Proposed Protective Order to October 26, 2012 - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
October 18, 2012 34 Featured Case ORDER Setting Teleconference: A Telephone Conference is set for 11/15/2012 at 11:00 AM before Judge Christopher J. Burke to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 10/18/2012. (dlk)
October 16, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christopher J. Burke for Mediation. (dlk)
October 16, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 33 Proposed Order filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation, ORDER, Setting Scheduling Order Deadlines: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. ( Claim Construction Opening Brief due by 5/24/2013., Answering due by 6/14/2013., A Pretrial Conference is set for 6/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet., Amended Pleadings due by 1/11/2013., Inequitable Conduct due by 5/17/2013., Fact Discovery due by 8/17/2013., Expert Reports: Opening due by 9/28/2013, Answering due by 10/26/2013, Completion of Expert Discovery due by 12/19/2013., Letter Briefing Re Summary Judgment: Opening due by 2/14/2014, Answering due by 2/28/2014, Reply due by 3/7/2014., Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2013., A Markman Hearing (4 hrs) is set for 7/22/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2014., A 7-day Jury Trial is set for 7/14/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4A before Judge Gregory M. Sleet.). Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 10/16/2012. (asw)
October 8, 2012 33 Joint PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING ORDER re 31 Status Report by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
October 5, 2012 32 Official Transcript of telephone conference held on 10 02 12 before Judge Sleet. Court Reporter/Transcriber Maurer. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2013. (kjm)
October 2, 2012 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory M. Sleet - Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 10/2/2012. Amendment of Parties/Joinder of Parties due by 1/11/2013; Re: Inequitable Conduct due by 5/17/2013., Fact Discovery due by 8/17/2013., Expert Reports: Opening due by 9/28/2013, Answering due by 10/26/2013, Completion of Expert Discovery due by 12/19/2013., Claim Construction Briefing: Opening due by 5/24/2013, Answering due by 6/14/2013., Markman Hearing (4 hrs) set for 7/22/2013 at 9:30 AM., Letter Briefing Re Summary Judgment: Opening due by 2/14/2014, Answering due by 2/28/2014, Reply due by 3/7/2014., Pretrial Order due by 6/13/2014., Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2014 at 10:00 AM., 7-day Jury Trial set for 7/14/2014 at 9:30 AM. Refer this case to the Magistrate for ADR. Plaintiff's counsel shall prepare a proposed scheduling order and submit to the court by 10/9/2012. (Court Reporter: Kevin Maurer.) (asw)
September 27, 2012 31 Joint STATUS REPORT by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order)(Coletti, Susan)
September 17, 2012 30 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Facebook Inc. re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California. (Caponi, Steven)
September 12, 2012 Featured Case ORAL ORDER SCHEDULING A RULE 16.2b SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE: A Rule 16.2b Scheduling Teleconference has been set for Tuesday, October 2, 2012, at 9:30 AM with the Honorable Gregory M. Sleet. A Joint Status Report (see court website) shall be filed no later than the close of business on Thursday, September 27, 2012. Counsel for plaintiff(s) is directed to arrange the conference call and contact chambers at (302) 573-6470 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Chief Judge Sleet on 9/12/2012. (ctd)
September 10, 2012 29 REPLY BRIEF re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 30, 2012 28 DECLARATION re 24 Answering Brief in Opposition, OF DEBBIE PINARD by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
August 30, 2012 27 DECLARATION re 24 Answering Brief in Opposition, OF LOGENDRA NAIDOO by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
August 30, 2012 26 DECLARATION re 24 Answering Brief in Opposition, OF THOMAS GRAY by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
August 30, 2012 25 DECLARATION re 24 Answering Brief in Opposition, OF CHERYLYN ESOY MIZZO IN SUPPORT OF MITEL NETWORKS CORPORATION AND MITEL (DELAWARE), INC.'S OPPOSITION TO FACEBOOK, INC.'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-6, # 2 Exhibits 7-12)(Coletti, Susan)
August 30, 2012 24 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 9/10/2012. (Coletti, Susan)
August 30, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cherylyn Esoy Mizzo filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/30/2012. (asw)
August 30, 2012 23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Cherylyn Esoy Mizzo - filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
August 30, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda L. Kordziel filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 8/30/2012. (asw)
August 30, 2012 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Linda L. Kordziel - filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation. (Coletti, Susan)
August 20, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Brian P. Wikner for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
August 13, 2012 21 DECLARATION re 19 Opening Brief in Support, 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Declaration of Jeremy Jordan) by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
August 13, 2012 20 DECLARATION re 19 Opening Brief in Support, 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Declaration of Brian Wikner) by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibits 2 through 8)(Caponi, Steven)
August 13, 2012 19 OPENING BRIEF in Support re 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed by Facebook Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 8/30/2012. (Caponi, Steven)
August 13, 2012 18 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Northern District of California - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
June 8, 2012 17 REQUEST for Oral Argument by Facebook Inc. re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6). (Caponi, Steven)
June 8, 2012 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
June 8, 2012 15 REPLY BRIEF re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
May 29, 2012 14 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc., Mitel Networks Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 6/8/2012. (Hufnal, AnnaMartina)
May 22, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Mark R. Weinstein for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. (els)
May 21, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Michael G. Rhodes for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. (dmp, )
May 15, 2012 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Heidi L. Keefe,Andrew Mace for Facebook Inc. added for electronic noticing. (rbe)
May 9, 2012 13 DECLARATION re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2012 12 MOTION to Dismiss Based upon Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(6) - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi L. Keefe filed by Facebook Inc., 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark R. Weinstein filed by Facebook Inc., 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Mace filed by Facebook Inc., 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Wikner filed by Facebook Inc., 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Rhodes filed by Facebook Inc. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 5/9/2012. (asw)
May 9, 2012 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael Rhodes - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel)(Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2012 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew Mace - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel)(Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2012 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Brian Wikner - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel)(Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2012 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Mark R. Weinstein - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel)(Caponi, Steven)
May 9, 2012 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Heidi L. Keefe - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification by Counsel)(Caponi, Steven)
April 2, 2012 Featured Case SO ORDERED, re 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and Proposed Order filed by Facebook Inc. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Facebook Inc. answer due 5/9/2012. Ordered by Chief Judge Gregory M. Sleet on 4/2/12. (mmm)
March 30, 2012 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and Proposed Order - filed by Facebook Inc.. (Caponi, Steven)
March 28, 2012 Case Assigned to Judge Gregory M. Sleet. Please include the initials of the Judge (GMS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
March 20, 2012 5 Return of Service Executed by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel (Delaware) Inc.. Facebook Inc. served on 3/19/2012, answer due 4/9/2012. (Hufnal, A. Martina)
March 19, 2012 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Facebook Inc. on 3/19/2012. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (dmp, )
March 16, 2012 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Mitel (Delaware) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mitel US Holdings Inc. for Mitel (Delaware) Inc.. (dmp, )
March 16, 2012 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 7,292,685; 5,940,834;. (dmp, )
March 16, 2012 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (dmp, )
March 16, 2012 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Facebook Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 311-1040023.) - filed by Mitel Networks Corporation, Mitel (Delaware) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(dmp, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Mitel Networks Corporation et al v. Facebook Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitel (Delaware), Inc.
Represented By: AnnaMartina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: Thomas Lee Halkowski
Represented By: Susan Morrison Coletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitel Networks Corporation
Represented By: Cherylyn E. Mizzo
Represented By: Linda Liu Kordziel
Represented By: AnnaMartina Tyreus Hufnal
Represented By: Thomas Lee Halkowski
Represented By: Susan Morrison Coletti
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Facebook Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Mace
Represented By: Heidi L. Keefe
Represented By: Steven L. Caponi
Represented By: Michael G. Rhodes
Represented By: Mark R. Weinstein
Represented By: Brian P. Wikner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]