Treadway v. Hedgpeth et al

Defendant: D. Bright, F. Tuvera, J. Rhodes, Nernan A. Hedgpeth, R. Muck and M. Sepulveda
Plaintiff: John L. Treadway
Case Number: 3:2013cv02113
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: PSLC MWD
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 4, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/4/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2014)
September 11, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE; ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION OR NOTICE REGARDING SUCH MOTION; INSTRUCTIONS TO CLERK. Dispositive Motion due by 12/10/2014. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/11/14. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2014)
June 10, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of defendants, an close the file. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 06/10/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/10/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
July 3, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REOPENING CASE; ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT. Amended Complaint due by 9/16/2013. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Certificate of Service)(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Treadway v. Hedgpeth et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Bright
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F. Tuvera
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Rhodes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nernan A. Hedgpeth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Muck
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Sepulveda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John L. Treadway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]