Ornelas v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al

Defendant: NDeX West, LLC and Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Plaintiff: Enrique Ornelas
Case Number: 3:2013cv02127
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 07/16/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
July 30, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATES REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Hon. William Alsup [adopting Report and Recommendations as to 10 Report and Recommendations].(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/30/2013: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (dt, COURT STAFF).
June 14, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why case should not be dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 6/28/2013. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 06/14/2013. (nclc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ornelas v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDeX West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Adam Frederick Summerfield
Represented By: Robert Arthur Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Ornelas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.