U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.

Plaintiff: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv02262
Filed: May 17, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Laurel Beeler
Presiding Judge: Claudia Wilken
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSES OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASE with 4:10-cv-03481 CW. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/20/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2013)
June 6, 2013 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING DISCOVERY DISPUTES TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE BEELER AND PROVIDING NOTICE OF INTENT TO APPOINT TECHNICAL ADVISOR. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 6/6/2013. (Attachments: # 1 resume)(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 11, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 12, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE: DISCOVERY PROCEDURES (amending signature only). Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/11/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
August 12, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING NETGEARS 58 MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING USEI LEAVE TO AMEND. Amended Pleadings due by 8/26/2013; Motions due by 9/9/2013; Replies due by 9/30/2013; Responses due by 9/23/2013. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 8/12/2013. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC v. Netgear, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Ethernet Innovations, LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Ward, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan K. Walsh
Represented By: Jessica M. Kattula
Represented By: Peter M Jones
Represented By: Jack Wesley Hill
Represented By: John Christopher Herman
Represented By: David Lee Gann
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netgear, Inc.
Represented By: Dan Duncan Davison
Represented By: Robert L Greeson
Represented By: John Anthony O'Malley
Represented By: Richard Stephen Zembek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]