Singh v. Lufthansa German Airlines

Defendant: Lufthansa German Airlines
Plaintiff: Santosh Singh
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02396
Filed: May 28, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
 
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/10/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
August 29, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue Initial Case Management Conference filed by Santosh Singh Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 10/10/13. Case Management Statement due by 10/3/2013. Case Management Conference set for 10/10/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/29/13. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
September 6, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 Stipulation filed by Santosh Singh Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/6/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013)
June 9, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC & Supplemental Statement filed by Lufthansa German Airlines Case Management Statement due by 6/19/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/26/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
June 19, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Lufthansa German Airlines Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/31/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/19/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
July 21, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 26 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Santosh Singh. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2014)
June 12, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Edward M. Chen. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/12/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Singh v. Lufthansa German Airlines
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lufthansa German Airlines
Represented By: James Joseph Corbelli
Represented By: Randall Steven Farrimond
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santosh Singh
Represented By: Gerald Carey Sterns
Represented By: Gerald C. Sterns
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]