ICON Health and Fitness, Inc. v. iHealth Lab Inc.

Plaintiff: ICON Health and Fitness, Inc.
Defendant: iHealth Lab Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02413
Filed: May 29, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 22, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
October 1, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/1/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
February 24, 2014 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 30 Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/24/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: ICON Health and Fitness, Inc. v. iHealth Lab Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICON Health and Fitness, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Hess
Represented By: Perry Reed Clark
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iHealth Lab Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Faucette
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]