Evans et al v. Hewlett Packard Company et al

Plaintiff: The Ernest Evans Corporation, The Last Twist Inc and Ernest Evans
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Company and Palm Inc.
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02477
Filed: June 3, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
 
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 49 Featured Case ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/25/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
July 24, 2013 54 Featured Case ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup DENYING 51 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
July 26, 2013 57 Featured Case SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 56 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 26, 2013 58 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY WILLIE GARY by Hon. William Alsup denying 52 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
August 2, 2013 62 Featured Case ORDER RE HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS [re 50 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Palm Inc., Hewlett Packard Company]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/2/2013. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2013)
August 5, 2013 63 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING GARY PHV by Judge Alsup denying 59 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; granting 60 Motion for Pro Hac Vice; denying 61 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 15, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 50 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
September 24, 2013 78 Featured Case ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup denying 76 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013)
October 1, 2013 80 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DISCOVERY STIPULATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 79 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 10, 2013 82 Featured Case ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge William Alsup [denying 71 Motion for Leave to File]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2013)
November 6, 2013 86 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS by Hon. William Alsup granting 85 Stipulation.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Evans et al v. Hewlett Packard Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ernest Evans Corporation
Represented By: Michael Ingrassi Santucci
Represented By: Willie E. Gary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Last Twist Inc
Represented By: Michael Ingrassi Santucci
Represented By: Willie E. Gary
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Evans
Represented By: Michael Ingrassi Santucci
Represented By: Willie E. Gary
Represented By: James Leonard Brown
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett Packard Company
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Represented By: Janet T. Munn
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Palm Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Charles Gratz
Represented By: Janet T. Munn
Represented By: Michael Henry Page
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]