Perkins v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Christopher A. Perkins
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02640
Filed: June 10, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting an Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Christopher A. Perkins. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 19, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
January 23, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/6/2014. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 23, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
July 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO ISSUE SUMMONS AND SERVE COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Perkins v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher A. Perkins
Represented By: Harvey Peter Sackett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]