Dahnken v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Dahnken
Case Number: 3:2013cv02838
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 9 Motion to Strike ; granting 10 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2013)
February 6, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 30 Motion to Dismiss (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
February 6, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/6/2014. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2014)
June 28, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Hon. Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 6/28/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
July 3, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/10/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2013 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/3/13. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dahnken v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Dahnken
Represented By: Charles Thomas Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.