Dyer v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Bobbie Pacheco Dyer
Case Number: 3:2013cv02858
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING MOTION HEARING re 35 Joint MOTION for Settlement filed by Melissa Edmunds, Bobbie Pacheco Dyer, Patricia Stallworth. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 1, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
May 12, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 35 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
October 22, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND ENHANCEMENT AWARDS by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 44 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
November 6, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXPENSES re 52 Declaration in Support, filed by Bobbie Pacheco Dyer, Patricia Stallworth, 51 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND ENHANCEMENT AWARDS. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dyer v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Pacheco Dyer
Represented By: Christine Mary Doyle
Represented By: Clayeo C. Arnold
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]