Holzhauer v. Rhoades

Plaintiff: Mary Holzhauer
Defendant: David P. Rhoades
Case Number: 3:2013cv02862
Filed: June 20, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2015 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION WITH MODIFICATION re 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Case Scheduling Deadlines With Respect to Plaintiff's Expert Mitch Stoller filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2015)
September 3, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 12 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re: Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuance of Initial Case Management Conference filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District, Mary Holzhauer. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 3, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2013)
February 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Add Party filed by Mary Holzhauer. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 28, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2014)
June 10, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Case Scheduling Deadlines filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Fact Discovery due by 9/15/2014. Expert Disclosures due 10/24/20 14. Expert Rebuttal due 11/7/2014. Expert Discovery due 11/24/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 11/26/2014. Pretrial Conference Statement due by 2/3/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/13/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 3/2/2015 - 3/16/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
August 18, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Hearing filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Set/Reset Deadlines as to 35 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Complaint, 34 MOTION to Dismiss Cross-Claim. Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 18, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
September 4, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Continuance of Discovery Deadlines filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4,2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
November 24, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1) GRANTING RHOADES' PETITION TO LIFT DEFAULT AND ACCEPTING CLAIM; 2) DENYING GOLDEN GATE BRIDGE, HIGHWAY & TRANSPORTATION DISTRICT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; AND 3) DENYING HOLZHAUER'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar denyin g as moot (34) Motion to Dismiss; denying (35) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:13-cv-02862-JST; granting (29) Motion to Set Aside Default in case 3:13-cv-05875-JST. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 24, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2014)
November 26, 2014 53 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION RE CONTINUANCE OF DISCOVERY DEADLINES filed by Mary Holzhauer. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 26, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
December 5, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE Continuing the Pending Summary Judgment Motion Hearings filed by Mary Holzhauer. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 5, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2014)
January 8, 2015 63 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Re Continuance of Discovery Deadline For Expert Disclosures filed by David P. Rhoades. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 8, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
January 21, 2015 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 71 STIPULATION Re Briefing Deadlines for Motion for Trial Continuance filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2015)
January 29, 2015 78 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Continuance of Case Scheduling Dates filed by Golden Gate Bridge Highway & Transportation District. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/5/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, Oakland. Jury Trial set for 6/22/2015 - 7/7/2015 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 29, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
February 12, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER 1) DENYING DISTRICT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND 2) DENYING RHOADES'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying 51 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2015)
May 11, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REFERENCE; ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER re 92 Letter filed by David P. Rhoades AND FILE JONT LETTER. Discovery Hearing, meet and confer, set for 5/12/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/11/15. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2015)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holzhauer v. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Holzhauer
Represented By: Edward M. Bull, III
Represented By: Kurt Leonard Micklow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Rhoades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.