Carpenters Union Local No. 2236 v. McGuire Furniture Company, The

Defendant: McGuire Furniture Company, The
Plaintiff: Carpenters Union Local No. 2236
Case Number: 3:2013cv02877
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:185 Suit to Compel Arbitration
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 26, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 17 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
December 6, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Judge William Alsup [granting 32 Motion to Compel]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2013)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenters Union Local No. 2236 v. McGuire Furniture Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McGuire Furniture Company, The
Represented By: Brian T. Ashe
Represented By: Joshua M. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Union Local No. 2236
Represented By: Blythe Mickelson
Represented By: Ezekiel D. Carder
Represented By: Daniel S Brome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.