Crumly v. Social Security Administration

Defendant: Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Robert Crumly
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv02969
Filed: June 27, 2013
 
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, reassigned to Judge Hon. William H. Orrick. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/25/13. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
October 18, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING COPIES AND NEED TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT re 14 Letter filed by Robert Crumly. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ***DOCKETED IN INCORRECT MATTER - PLEASE DISREGARD***STIPULATION FOR ORDER AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE EACH SIDE TO BEAR THEIR OWN FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 10/18/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013) Modified on 10/18/2013 (jmdS, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 11/21/2013. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2013)
January 15, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RELIEF by Hon. William H. Orrick denying 21 Motion for Relief. The Motion for Relief is DENIED. The Court notes that this case was dismissed WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Mr. Crumly is free to file a new case against the Social Security Administration. However, any new complaint must correct the deficiencies previously identified in order to state a claim.(jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Crumly v. Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Crumly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]